Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015013679 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | US31643299 | 21.05.1999 | US201313962493 | 08.08.2013 | US201113114884 | 24.05.2011 | US201414476953 | 04.09.2014 | US86594404 | 11.06.2004 | US45756406 | 14.07.2006 | US37448703 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8857430 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2014 | B2 | US2014069430 | 13.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | US31643299 | 21.05.1999 | US201313962493 | 08.08.2013 | US201113114884 | 24.05.2011 | US86594404 | 11.06.2004 | US45756406 | 14.07.2006 | US37448703 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8528556 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2013 | B2 | US2011265794 | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | US31643299 | 21.05.1999 | US201113114884 | 24.05.2011 | US86594404 | 11.06.2004 | US45756406 | 14.07.2006 | US37448703 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7967012 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2011 | B2 | US2006243281 | 02.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | US31643299 | 21.05.1999 | US86594404 | 11.06.2004 | US45756406 | 14.07.2006 | US37448703 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7077132 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2006 | B2 | US2004237963 | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | US31643299 | 21.05.1999 | US86594404 | 11.06.2004 | US37448703 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6951217 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2005 | B2 | US2003154979 | 21.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31643299 | 21.05.1999 | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | US37448703 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3737698B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2006 | B2 | JP2002516159 | 04.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | AU9900386 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2269675 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2013 | A3 | EP2269675 | 05.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99923310 | 21.05.1999 | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | EP07119907 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2269674 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2018 | B1 | EP2269674 | 10.07.2013 | A3 | EP2269674 | 05.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99923310 | 21.05.1999 | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | EP07119907 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2269673 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2018 | B1 | EP2269673 | 10.07.2013 | A3 | EP2269673 | 05.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99923310 | 21.05.1999 | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | EP07119907 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1878458 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B1 | EP1878458 | 02.09.2009 | A3 | EP1878458 | 16.01.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99923310 | 21.05.1999 | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1083953 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2007 | B1 | EP1083953 | 22.05.2002 | A4 | EP1083953 | 21.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | AU9900386 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4023699 | Global Dossier | 13.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | AU9900386 | 21.05.1999 | AU4023699 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU761189B | Global Dossier | 29.05.2003 | B2 | AU3709901 | 26.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | AU3121199 | 21.05.1999 | AU3709901 | 18.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU734771B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2001 | B2 | AU3121199 | 02.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | AU3121199 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006225224B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2010 | B2 | AU2006225224 | 26.10.2006 | A2 | AU2006225224 | 26.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2003236487 | 26.08.2003 | AU2006225224 | 04.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003236487B | Global Dossier | 02.11.2006 | B2 | Priority number | Date | AU2003236487 | 26.08.2003 | AU3709901 | 18.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2774645 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99923310 | 21.05.1999 | EP10185515 | 21.05.1999 | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | EP07119907 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69937492T | 21.08.2008 | T2 | DE69937492D1 | 20.12.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | AU9900386 | 21.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9961088 | Global Dossier | 02.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5248560B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2013 | B2 | JP2011005274 | 13.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4643247B | Global Dossier | 02.03.2011 | B2 | JP2005161068 | 23.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE377437T | 15.11.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2446523T | 10.03.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6532959 | 18.03.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP366398 | 22.05.1998 | Type | Earlier application | EP1878458 | EP2269675 | EP1083953 |