EP2774645 - Ventilatory assistance for treatment of cardiac failure and cheyne-stokes breathing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed Ltd. 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berthon-Jones, Michael 7 Leonay Parade Leonay, New South Wales 2750 / AU | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14170743.0 | 21.05.1999 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | AU1998PP03663 | 22.05.1998 Original published format: AU PP366398 | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2774645 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
A61M16/00 (EP,US);
A61M16/0003 (US);
A61M16/0051 (US);
A61M16/0057 (US);
A61M16/0069 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M16/0858 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3303 (US);
A61M2230/42 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2015/17] |
Former [2014/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Atemhilfe zur Behandlung von Herzversagen und Cheyne-Stokes-Atmung | [2014/37] | English: | Ventilatory assistance for treatment of cardiac failure and cheyne-stokes breathing | [2014/37] | French: | Assistance respiratoire pour le traitement de l'insuffisance cardiaque et la respiration de Cheyne-Stokes | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 20.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07119907.9 / EP1878458 | EP10185515.3 / EP2269675 | EP99923310.9 / EP1083953 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9211054 (PURITAN BENNETT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * page 6, line 25 - page 36, line 11; table app. 1 *; | [XD]WO9812965 (RESMED LTD [AU]) [XD] 1,2,4-7,9-11* page 12, line 14 - page 39, line 6 * | by applicant | WO9812965 | - WILCOX I ET AL., VENTILATORY CONTROL IN PATIENTS WITH SLEEP APNOEA AND LEFT VENTRICULAR DYSFUNCTION: COMPARISON OF OBSTRUCTIVE AND CENTRAL SLEEP APNOEA, (1998), vol. 11, pages 7 - 13 | - NAUGHTON M ET AL., "Role of hyperventilation in the pathogenesis of central sleep apneas in patients with congestive heart failure", AM REV RESPIR DIS, (1993), vol. 148, pages 330 - 338 | - ANDREAS ET AL., "Cheyne-Stokes respiration and prognosis in congestive heart failure", AM J CARDIOL, (1996), vol. 78, pages 1260 - 1264 | - NAUGHTON MT ET AL., "Treatment of congestive heart failure and Cheyne-Stokes respiration during sleep by continuous positive airway pressure", AMJ RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1995), vol. 5Í, pages 92 - 97 | - NAUGHTON MT ET AL., "Effects of nasal CPAP on sympathetic activity in patients with heart failure and central sleep apnea", AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1995), vol. 152, pages 473 - 479 | - NAUGHTON MT ET AL., "Effect of continuous positive airway pressure on central sleep apnea and nocturnal PC02 in heart failure", AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1994), vol. 150, pages 1598 - 1604 | - JOUNIEUX ET AL., "Effects of nasal positive pressure hyperventilation on the glottis in normal sleeping subjects", JAPPL PHYSIOL, (1995), vol. 79, pages 186 - 193 | - MEHTA ET AL., "Randomized prospective trial of bilevel versus continuous positive airway pressure in acute pulmonary oedema", CRIT CARE MED, (1997), vol. 25, pages 620 - 628 |