EP2774609 - Pharmaceutical compositions comprising a HMG COA reductase inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrazeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Creekmore, Joseph AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington Concord Pike, P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE Delaware 19850-5437 / US | 02 /
Wiggins, Norman AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington Concord Pike, P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE Delaware 19850-5437 / US | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Burns, Tracy Anne, et al AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Burns, Tracy Anne, et al AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14170807.3 | 04.08.2000 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | GB20000001621 | 26.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0001621 | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2774609 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K31/505, A61K9/16, A61K9/26, A61K9/32 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,FI,KR,US);
A61K31/435 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (FI);
A61K9/2009 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2813 (EP,FI,US);
A61K9/2826 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2014/37] | Extension states | AL | 10.03.2015 | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | 10.03.2015 | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen mit einem HMG-COA-Reduktase-Hemmer | [2014/37] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions comprising a HMG COA reductase inhibitor | [2014/37] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques comportant un inhibiteur de réductase HMG COA | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 29.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2015 | Observations by third parties | 18.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 03.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00951701.2 / EP1251831 | EP08165575.5 / EP2018853 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0336298 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15* example - *; | [YD]EP0521471 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [YD] 1-15 * examples 1,7 *; | [YD]GB2262229 (SANDOZ LTD [CH]) [YD] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 4; example 4 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 4 *; | [Y]WO9416693 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 4 * * table III *; | [Y]WO9723200 (KOWA CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 27 - page 3, line 5 * * page 3, line 15 - line 25 * * page 5, line 3 - page 7, line 14 * * examples 1,2,4 * * claim - *; | [Y] - GRAUL A ET AL, "ZD-4522: Hypolipidemic HMG-CoA reductase inhibitor.", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (199905), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 511 - 513, XP000882032 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.1999.024.05.489462 | by applicant | EP0521471 | GB2262229 | - BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 437 - 444 | - Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION | - Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Tablets, vol. 1 | other | EP1223918 |