Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9286660 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2016 | B2 | US2014363080 | 11.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201310227302 | 08.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6398335B | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B2 | JP2014238839 | 18.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201310227302 | 08.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104240183B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2017 | B | CN104240183 | 24.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201310227302 | 08.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2811456 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2015 | A3 | EP2811456 | 10.12.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CN201310227302 | 08.06.2013 |