EP2811715 - Systems and methods for intermediate message authentication in a switched-path network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landhammer, Martin c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 02 /
Nicholl, Shawn David c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 03 /
Haas, Wally c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/46] |
Former [2014/50] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14171083.0 | 04.06.2014 | [2014/50] | Priority number, date | US201361830655P | 04.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361830655 P | US201314137641 | 20.12.2013 Original published format: US201314137641 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2811715 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2811715 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2811715 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/85, H04L9/32, H04L12/723, H04L29/06 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
H04L63/12 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (US);
H04B10/85 (US);
H04L63/14 (EP,US);
H04L9/321 (US);
H04L45/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | H04L29/06, H04L12/723 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2014/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Zwischenauthentisierung von Nachrichten in einem switched-path-Netzwerk | [2014/50] | English: | Systems and methods for intermediate message authentication in a switched-path network | [2014/50] | French: | Systèmes et procédés d'authentification de message intermédiaire dans un réseau de trajet commuté | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 11.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2014 | AL | 14.11.2018 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | MT | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | IE | 04.06.2019 | LU | 04.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.06.2014 | |
AL | 14.11.2018 | ||
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
MT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 04.06.2019 | ||
LU | 04.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 04.06.2014 | |
AL | 14.11.2018 | ||
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 04.06.2019 | ||
LU | 04.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 04.06.2019 | ||
LU | 04.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 04.06.2019 | ||
LU | 04.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 04.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004268123 (LE FRANCK [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0074] * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [Y]WO2010003713 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 4,5,15 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 7, line 14 * * page 8, line 15 - page 17, line 36 * * figures 5-7 *; | [Y] - DONG YUANHE, "Research and design of safe campus all-in-one-card network based on MPLS VPN", CYBER TECHNOLOGY IN AUTOMATION, CONTROL, AND INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS (CYBER), 2012 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120527), doi:10.1109/CYBER.2012.6320094, ISBN 978-1-4673-1420-6, pages 908 - 910, XP032258958 [Y] 1-3,6-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CYBER.2012.6320094 | [A] - S Kent, "Network Working Group", (20050101), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/pdf/rfc4301.pdf, (20141114), XP055153192 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - S Kent, "Network Working Group", (20050101), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/pdf/rfc4302.pdf, (20141114), XP055153253 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |