EP2952629 - Vehicle for transporting a bridging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pearson Engineering Limited Armstrong Works Scotswood Road Newcastle upon Tyne, NE15 6UX / GB | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renwick, Peter c/o Pearson Engineering Limited Wincomblee Road Walker Newcastle upon Tyne, Tyne & Wear NE6 3QS / GB | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [2015/50] | Application number, filing date | 14171415.4 | 05.06.2014 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2952629 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E01D15/127, B66F7/24 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
E01D15/127 (EP,US);
B60P3/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fahrzeug zum Transport einer Brückenvorrichtung | [2015/50] | English: | Vehicle for transporting a bridging apparatus | [2015/50] | French: | Véhicule pour le transport d'un dispositif de pont | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4962556 (HELMKE RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9 * figures 1-7,14,15 * * column 4, lines 14-37,49-61 * * page 5, lines 47-68 * [A] 4-7,10; | [XA]US4663793 (PARRAMORE THOMAS S [GB]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * figures 4A-4D,6A-9B,13-17 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 18 * * column 10, lines 27-59 * * column 11, line 25 - column 12, line 3 * [A] 4-7,10; | [XA]US3305885 (JEAN VAILLANT, et al) [X] 10 * the whole document * [A] 1-9; | [X]EP1156163 (ENTPR MORILLON CORVOL COURBOT [FR]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0027] , [0030] - [0033] - [0035] , [0036] * |