blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2810759

EP2810759 - Separating agent and its use for the manufacture of polyurethane moulded bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acmos Chemie KG
Industriestrasse 37 und 49
28199 Bremen / DE
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Schneider, Valentina
Zwoller Straße 8
28259 Bremen / DE
02 / Klyszcz-Nasko, Holger
Vechtaer Weg 13
28816 Stuhr / DE
03 / Prochnow, Peter
Delmestraße 24
28199 Bremen / DE
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Scholz, Volker
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Scholz, Volker
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14171438.606.06.2014
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateDE2013100963606.06.2013         Original published format: DE102013009636
[2014/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810759
Date:10.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810759
Date:07.10.2015
Language:DE
[2015/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2014
ClassificationIPC:B29C33/64
[2014/50]
CPC:
B29C33/64 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/41]
Former [2014/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Trennmittel und dessen Verwendung für die Herstellung von Polyurethan-Formkörpern[2014/50]
English:Separating agent and its use for the manufacture of polyurethane moulded bodies[2014/50]
French:Moyen de séparation et son utilisation pour la fabrication de corps de formage en polyuréthane[2014/50]
Examination procedure28.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/11]
20.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2015Fee for grant paid
27.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)08.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2014
AL07.10.2015
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE06.06.2016
LU06.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU06.06.2014
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE06.06.2016
LU06.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
Former [2018/38]HU06.06.2014
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE06.06.2016
LU06.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
Former [2018/32]HU06.06.2014
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE06.06.2016
LU06.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
Former [2018/30]HU06.06.2014
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE06.06.2016
LU06.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
Former [2017/38]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE06.06.2016
BE30.06.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
BE30.06.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
BE30.06.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/25]FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/24]FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/23]HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/22]LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/21]LT07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
Former [2016/20]LT07.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2010081462  (ACMOS CHEMIE KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * Ansprüche 1, 7 *;
 [Y]WO2012007242  (EVONIK GOLDSCHMIDT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * Ansprüche 1, 8, 9 *;
 [Y]EP1719597  (GOLDSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * Anspruch 1 *
by applicantUS4936917
 EP0207192
 DE102007027027
 DE102010001531
 US5807956
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.