Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] |
20.08.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.01.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.12.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
12.12.2014 | Change - classification | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
12.12.2014 | Change - classification | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
07.11.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
07.11.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.11.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.10.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
05.09.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |