EP2787569 - High temperature fuel cell system with exhaust gas reclamation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Badenhop, Thomas Breslauer Strasse 12 51688 Wipperfürth / DE | 02 /
Berg, Joachim Strucker Strasse 54 42859 Remscheid / DE | 03 /
Götz, Klaus Nibelungenstrasse 29 42653 Solingen / DE | 04 /
Oerder, Bodo Karl-Evang-Strasse 48 42897 Remscheid / DE | 05 /
Kohlhage, Jörg Heßlerstrasse 174 45329 Essen / DE | 06 /
Kraus, Matthias Markusstrasse 4 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | 07 /
Paulus, Jochen Kreuzweger Strasse 11 42655 Solingen / DE | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2014/41] | Application number, filing date | 14172297.5 | 28.01.2009 | [2014/41] | Priority number, date | AT20080000198 | 07.02.2008 Original published format: AT 1982008 | [2014/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2787569 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2787569 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/06 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
H01M8/0612 (EP);
H01M8/04022 (EP);
H01M8/04164 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hochtemperaturbrennstoffzellensystem mit Abgasrückführung | [2014/41] | English: | High temperature fuel cell system with exhaust gas reclamation | [2014/41] | French: | Système de cellules combustibles à haute température doté d'un recyclage des gaz d'échappement | [2014/41] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 15.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 21.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09151519.7 / EP2088638 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 13.06.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.11.2014 | 13.06.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.11.2014 | 13.06.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.11.2014 | 13.06.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   03.11.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE102006003740 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [I] 1-5 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0032] , [0040] *; | [A]WO2004095618 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 * * page 2, lines 7-14 * * page 7, lines 12-31 * * page 11, lines 18-33 * * claims 1-26 *; | [AD]DE19822689 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [AD] 3 * claims 1-23 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 3 * * column 6, lines 23-58 * * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 29 *; | [A]US2003235751 (KELLY SEAN M [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0039] * * figure 2 * | by applicant | DE4005468 | DE19934649 | DE102005038733 | DE19822689 |