Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9557755 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2017 | B2 | US2015362932 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA201470355 | 13.06.2014 | EP14172394 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6546790B | Global Dossier | 17.07.2019 | B2 | JP2016029793 | 03.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | DKPA201470355 | 13.06.2014 | EP14172394 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105282673B | Global Dossier | 05.06.2020 | B | CN105282673 | 27.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | DKPA201470355 | 13.06.2014 | EP14172394 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK201470355 | 11.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA201470355 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2955938 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14172394 | 13.06.2014 |