EP2955938 - Interface circuit for a hearing aid and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN ReSound A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahrendt, Henrik Moseagervej 50 2680 Solrød Strand / DK | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2015/51] | Application number, filing date | 14172394.0 | 13.06.2014 | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2955938 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
H04R25/00 (EP);
H04R2460/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2015/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schnittstellenschaltung für ein Hörgerät und Verfahren | [2015/51] | English: | Interface circuit for a hearing aid and method | [2015/51] | French: | Circuit d'interface destiné à une prothèse auditive et procédé | [2015/51] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 25.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/40] | Appeal following examination | 20.01.2020 | Appeal received No. T1211/20 | 01.04.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.08.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006023519 (CHOI SEOUK-KYU [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0026] - [0033] - [0051] - [0053]; figures 1,6 * |