EP2957339 - Radial flow horizontal catalytic reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Casale SA Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6 6900 Lugano-Besso / CH | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarozzo, Mirco Via L. Piffaretti 20d 6853 Ligornetto / CH | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 14172845.1 | 17.06.2014 | [2015/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2957339 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02, B01J8/04, B01J8/00 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
B01J8/0214 (EP,CN,US);
B01J8/0496 (EP,CN,US);
B01J8/0035 (EP,CN,US);
B01J8/0285 (US);
B01J8/0407 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2208/00194 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2208/0053 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2208/00814 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00024 (EP,US);
B01J2219/182 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Horizontaler katalytischer Reaktor mit radialer Durchströmung | [2015/52] | English: | Radial flow horizontal catalytic reactor | [2015/52] | French: | Reacteur catalytique horizontal à ecoulement radial | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 11.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4452760 (PETERSON ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 2, lines 8-15 * * column 3, lines 12-16; figures 1,1A,2 * [Y] 2 [I] 8; | [Y]EP1300190 (METHANOL CASALE SA [CH]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0020] , [0022] , [0 30] , [0032] , [0033]; figure 5 *; | [A]WO9524961 (METHANOL CASALE SA [CH], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1464384 | EP1818094 | EP2014356 |