EP2781985 - Deciphering, deciphering and information processing apparatus and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/39] | Deciphering device using a cryptographic key changed at a predetermined timing | ||
[2015/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishiguro, Ryuji c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Osawa, Yoshitomo c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
Osakabe, Yoshio c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
Sato, Makoto c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
Shima, Hisato US Research Laboratories 12610 Paseo Flores Saratoga, CA California 95070 / US | 06 /
Asano, Tomoyuki c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2014/39] | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14173181.0 | 20.04.1998 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | JP19970106136 | 23.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10613697 | [2014/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2781985 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2781985 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G06F13/00, G06F3/06, G11B20/00 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
H04L9/0891 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/445 (EP,US);
G06F21/6209 (EP,US);
G06F21/725 (EP,US);
G06F21/73 (EP,US);
G06F21/85 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00246 (EP,US);
G11B20/00492 (EP,US);
G11B20/00521 (EP,US);
H04L9/008 (EP,US);
H04L9/0861 (US);
H04L9/0869 (US);
G06F2211/007 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2107 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2525 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
H04L2209/603 (EP,US);
H04L2209/605 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2014/39] | Title | German: | VERSCHLÜSSELUNGS-, ENTSCHLÜSSELUNGS- UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2015/47] | English: | Deciphering, deciphering and information processing apparatus and methods | [2015/44] | French: | Appareil de déchiffrage utilisant une clef de chiffrage qui est changée à des instants prédéterminés | [2014/39] |
Former [2014/39] | Vorrichtung zur Entschlüsselung mit einem sich zu vorbestimmten Zeitpunkten ändernden Schlüssel | ||
Former [2014/39] | Deciphering device using a cryptographic key changed at a predetermined timing | Examination procedure | 18.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06076723.3 / EP1742137 | EP98303006.5 / EP0875813 | Divisional application(s) | EP15184925.4 / EP2998820 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4531021 (BLUESTEIN LEO I [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2 - column 4, line 5 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0720326 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [AD] - SCHNEIER BRUCE, Applied Cryptography Second Edition : protocols, algorithms, and source code in C, USA, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1996), XP002104180 [AD] 1-6 * page 30 - page 31 * * page 180 - page 181 * * page 265 - page 301 * * page 351 - page 354 * * page 429 - page 459 * | [A] - "Encryption for Open VMS, Version 1.3", DIGITAL SOFTWARE PRODUCT DESCRIPTIONS, UPDATED: 30 APRIL 1996, RETRIEVED FROM INTERNET: 27 MAY 1999 VIA HTTP://WWW.DIGITAL.COM/INFO/SP2674/, (19960430), XP002104179 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHNEIER BRUCE, "Applied Cryptography Second Edition : protocols, algorithms, and source code in C, USA, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1996), XP002104588 [A] 1-6 * page 202 - page 203 * | by applicant | - BRUCE SCHNEIER, Applied Cryptography, WILEY | - Applied Cryptography |