EP2816357 - Method of detection of Gram-negative bacteria periplasmic space and cell wall outer membrane proteins by mass spectrometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univerzita Karlova V Praze Lékarska fakulta v Plzni Husova 3 306 05 Plzen / CZ | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HRABAK, Jaroslav Valticka 7 32300 Plzen / CZ | 02 /
PAPAGIANNITSIS, Konstantinos Brenkova 1 301 00 Plzen / CZ | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Hartvichova, Katerina, et al HARBER IP s.r.o. Dukelskych hrdinu 567/52 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | [2019/16] |
Former [2014/52] | Hartvichova, Katerina Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3 150 00 Praha 5 / CZ | Application number, filing date | 14173225.5 | 20.06.2014 | [2014/52] | Priority number, date | CZ20130000473 | 20.06.2013 Original published format: CZ 20130473 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816357 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816357 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C12Q1/18, C12Q1/34, C12Q1/04, G01N33/569, G01N33/94 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
C12Q1/18 (EP,US);
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
G01N33/56911 (EP,US);
G01N33/6851 (EP,US);
G01N33/9446 (EP,US);
G01N2333/986 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Detektion des Periplasmaraums gramnegativer Bakterien und von Zellwandaußenmembranproteinen durch Massenspektrometrie | [2014/52] | English: | Method of detection of Gram-negative bacteria periplasmic space and cell wall outer membrane proteins by mass spectrometry | [2014/52] | French: | Procédé de détection par spectrométrie de masse des protéines de l'espace périplasmique et de la membrane externe de la paroi cellulaire de bactéries gram négatives | [2018/48] |
Former [2014/52] | Procédé de détection d'espace périplasmique à bactéries gram négatives et protéines de membrane externe de paroi cellulaire par spectrométrie de masse | Examination procedure | 25.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 08.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2014 | AL | 17.04.2019 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | HR | 17.04.2019 | IT | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | MK | 17.04.2019 | MT | 17.04.2019 | NL | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | RS | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | SM | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | IE | 20.06.2019 | LU | 20.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | NO | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.06.2014 | |
AL | 17.04.2019 | ||
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
MT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 20.06.2019 | ||
LU | 20.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.06.2014 | |
AL | 17.04.2019 | ||
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 20.06.2019 | ||
LU | 20.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 20.06.2019 | ||
LU | 20.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 20.06.2019 | ||
LU | 20.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 20.06.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 17.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008009029 (GOVORUN VADIM M [RU], et al) [I] 1-8 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0023] - [0028] - [0044] - [0054]; claims 1-19 *; | [I]WO2012113699 (BRUKER DALTONIK GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-8 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] - [0039] - [0050] - [0057]; figures 1-4; claims 1-19 *; | [I] - JOHANNA E CAMARA ET AL, "Discrimination between wild-type and ampicillin-resistant Escherichia coli by matrix-assisted laser desorption/ionization time-of-flight mass spectrometry", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20070912), vol. 389, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S00216-007-1558-7, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 1633 - 1638, XP019559826 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * * abstract * * figures 1,2; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-007-1558-7 | [I] - FRANCESCO IMPERI ET AL, "Analysis of the periplasmic proteome of Pseudomonas aeruginosa, a metabolically versatile opportunistic pathogen", PROTEOMICS, (20090401), vol. 9, no. 7, doi:10.1002/pmic.200800618, ISSN 1615-9853, pages 1901 - 1915, XP055142446 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 1902, column right, paragraphs 2.1-2.3, 2.3,2.6,2.7 - page 1904; figures 1-3; tables 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pmic.200800618 | [I] - MARIE-FRÉDÉRIQUE LARTIGUE, "Matrix-assisted laser desorption ionization time-of-flight mass spectrometry for bacterial strain characterization", INFECTION, GENETICS AND EVOLUTION, (20130101), vol. 13, doi:10.1016/j.meegid.2012.10.012, ISSN 1567-1348, pages 230 - 235, XP055124779 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * * page 231, column left, paragraph four - page 232, column right, paragraph second * * page 233, column right, paragraph last - page 234, column right, paragraph first * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.meegid.2012.10.012 | [I] - ANDREAS WIESER ET AL, "MALDI-TOF MS in microbiological diagnostics-identification of microorganisms and beyond (mini review)", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20111225), vol. 93, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s00253-011-3783-4, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 965 - 974, XP055143343 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 971, column left, paragraph second - page 972, column left, paragraph third * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-011-3783-4 | [IY] - SVENJA JARCHOW ET AL, "Identification of potential substrate proteins for the periplasmic Escherichia coli chaperone Skp", PROTEOMICS, (20081201), vol. 8, no. 23-24, doi:10.1002/pmic.200800288, ISSN 1615-9853, pages 4987 - 4994, XP055142459 [I] 1 * the whole document * * abstract * * figures 1,2; table 1 * [Y] 2-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pmic.200800288 | [IY] - CLODAGH MCNULTY ET AL, "The cell surface expression of group 2 capsular polysaccharides in Escherichia coli: the role of KpsD, RhsA and a multi-protein complex at the pole of the cell.", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (20060201), vol. 59, no. 3, doi:MMI5010, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 907 - 22, XP055142434 [I] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2958.2005.05010.x | [Y] - GUTSCHE J ET AL, "Biochemical analysis of alginate biosynthesis protein AlgX from Pseudomonas aeruginosa: purification of an AlgX-MucD (AlgY) protein complex", BIOCHIMIE, MASSON, PARIS, FR, vol. 88, no. 3-4, ISSN 0300-9084, (20060301), pages 245 - 251, (20060301), XP027919594 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | [Y] - C. FENSELAU ET AL, "Identification of -Lactamase in Antibiotic-Resistant Bacillus cereus Spores", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20071207), vol. 74, no. 3, doi:10.1128/AEM.00788-07, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 904 - 906, XP055005548 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.00788-07 | [Y] - KESERU J S ET AL, "Identification of beta-lactamases in human and bovine isolates of Staphylococcus aureus strains having borderline resistance to penicillinase-resistant penicillins (PRPs) with proteomic methods", VETERINARY MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 147, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-1135, (20110110), pages 96 - 102, (20100618), XP027525161 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - SAVES ET AL, "Mass spectral kinetic study of acylation and deacylation during the hydrolysis of penicillins and cefotaxime by beta-lactamase TEM-1 and the G238S mutant.", BIOCHEMISTRY, (19950901), vol. 34, no. 37, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 11660 - 11667, XP055005564 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00037a003 | by applicant | WO2011154517 | US2012196309 | WO2012143535 | WO2012143534 | - SCHAUMANN R; KNOOP N; GENZEL GH; LOSENSKY K; ROSENKRANZ C; STINGU CS; SCHELLENBERGER W; RODLOFF AC; ESCHRICH K, "A step towards the discrimination of beta-lactamase-producing clinical isolates of Enterobacteriaceae and Pseudomonas aeruginosa by MALDI-TOF mass spectrometry", MED. SCI. MONIT., (2012), vol. 18, pages MT71 - MT77 | - CAMARA JE; HAYS FA, "Discrimination between wild- type and ampicillin-resistant Escherichia coli by matrix-assisted laser desorption/ionization time-of-flight mass spectrometry", ANAL. BIOANAL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 389, doi:doi:10.1007/s00216-007-1558-7, pages 1633 - 1638, XP019559826 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-007-1558-7 |