EP2838036 - System and method for incrementally replicating investigative analysis data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2019/46] |
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states Palantir Technologies, Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Suite 300 Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landau, Alexander c/o Palantir Technologies, Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
Wilson, Tim c/o Palantir Technologies, Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 03 /
Ducott, III, Richard Allen c/o Palantir Technologies, Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14173360.0 | 20.06.2014 | [2015/08] | Priority number, date | US201313922437 | 20.06.2013 Original published format: US201313922437 | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2838036 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2838036 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F11/14 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,US);
G06F16/2358 (EP,US);
G06F16/273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] |
Former [2015/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur inkrementellen Replikation investigativer Analysedaten | [2015/08] | English: | System and method for incrementally replicating investigative analysis data | [2015/08] | French: | Système et procédé de réplication de manière incrémentielle des données d'analyse d'investigation | [2015/08] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.02.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/28] | 01.06.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/28] | Appeal following examination | 09.04.2020 | Appeal received No. T1299/20 | 01.06.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5603024 (GOLDRING ROBERT D [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3 - column 10 *; | [I]US2005044088 (LINDSAY BRUCE G [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0052] *; | [A] - SAITO Y, "Consistency Management in Optimistic Replication Algorithms", INTERNET CITATION, (20010615), URL: citeseer.nj.nec.com/saito01consistency.html, (20030512), XP002241278 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 3 * * page 3, column l, paragraph 4 - page 4, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 6 * * page 8, column r, paragraph l - page 9, column r, paragraph 1 * | [A] - MAHAJAN S ET AL, "Grouping techniques for update propagation in intermittently connected databases", DATA ENGINEERING, 1998. PROCEEDINGS., 14TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 23-27 FEB. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980223), doi:10.1109/ICDE.1998.655756, ISBN 978-0-8186-8289-6, pages 46 - 53, XP010268298 [A] 1-15 * page 46, column l, paragraph 1 - page 49, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.1998.655756 | by applicant | - "Time, Clocks and the Ordering of Events in a Distributed System", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ACM, (1978), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 558 - 565 |