EP2825011 - Traction converter and railway vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2016/34] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuda, Yosuke c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
Funakoshi, Sunao c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Takeshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
Terakado, Shuichi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Gill, Stephen Charles, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/34] |
Former [2015/03] | Gill, Stephen Charles, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14173910.2 | 25.06.2014 | [2015/03] | Priority number, date | JP20130144102 | 10.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013144102 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2825011 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2825011 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2825011 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
H05K7/20936 (EP,US);
B61K13/00 (KR);
H05K7/20918 (CN);
H05K7/209 (US);
B61C17/00 (US);
B61C17/12 (US);
B61C3/00 (US);
B61D1/00 (US);
B61D17/00 (US);
B61D49/00 (KR);
H01L23/42 (KR);
H05K7/20 (KR);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Title | German: | Traktionsumrichter und Schienenfahrzeug | [2015/03] | English: | Traction converter and railway vehicle | [2015/03] | French: | Convertisseur de traction et véhicule ferroviaire | [2015/03] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 06.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2014 | AL | 24.08.2016 | AT | 24.08.2016 | BE | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | RS | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | IS | 24.12.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.06.2014 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 25.06.2014 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 25.06.2014 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.06.2014 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 24.08.2016 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2000161880 (TOSHIBA CORP) [AD] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]EP2469996 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]EP2574159 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2000161880 | JP4948625B |