Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2960035
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.01.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] |
30.09.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.06.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.09.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.12.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.10.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.09.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
29.06.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.06.2017 |
First examination report |
|
07.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
01.07.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
25.06.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
01.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
04.11.2015 |
Change - representative |
|