EP2960035 - Method and device for injection moulding or embossing/pressing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TCTech Sweden AB Pirgatan 13 374 35 Karlshamn / SE | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jäderberg, Jan Storvretsvägen 154 SE-16347 Spånga / SE | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Industripatent i Växjö AB Box 3130 350 43 Växjö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 14174159.5 | 26.06.2014 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2960035 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/38, B29C33/06, // B29C43/52, B29C45/73, B29C45/37 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
B29C33/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C45/73 (KR,US);
B29C43/02 (US);
B29C43/52 (CN,US);
B29C53/04 (US);
B29C59/002 (US);
C23C4/11 (US);
C23C4/129 (US);
C23C4/18 (US);
B29C2033/385 (KR);
B29C2043/025 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C59/02 (EP,US);
B29K2105/256 (US);
B29K2909/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29K2995/0005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2016/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Spritzgießen oder Prägen/Pressen | [2016/01] | English: | Method and device for injection moulding or embossing/pressing | [2016/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de moulage par injection ou gaufrage/compression | [2016/01] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 16.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 01.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6391208 ; | [A]JP2013067168 ; | [A]CN101249698 ; | [Y]EP0505738 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 41; figure - *; | [A]US5483043 (STURMAN JR PHILIP C [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 60; figure - *; | [Y]US5783259 (MCDONALD ROBERT R [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 8, lines 6-23; figure 3 *; | [A]US2002181224 (TAHARA HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* paragraphs [0004] - [0015]; figure -; example - *; | [YD]WO2013002703 (TCTECH SWEDEN AB [SE], et al) [YD] 1-7 * page 6, lines 1-28; figure 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 22, Database accession no. 1988-150932, XP002735880 & JPS6391208 A 19880421 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 30, Database accession no. 2013-F61011, XP002735881 & JP2013067168 A 20130418 (TOPY KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 66, Database accession no. 2008-L19741, XP002735882 & CN101249698 A 20080827 (WUHAN YOUKE SURFACE PROJECTION CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2013002703 |