EP2865765 - Complex miRNA sets as novel biomarkers for an acute coronary syndrome [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hummingbird Diagnostics GmbH Im Neuenheimer Feld 583 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states Comprehensive Biomarker Center GmbH Im Neuenheimer Feld 583 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Andreas Albert-Schweitzer-Str. 6 66346 Püttlingen / DE | 02 /
Stähler, Peer Obere Clignetstr. 14 68167 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Beier, Markus Marc-Aurel-Weg 20 69469 Weinheim / DE | 04 /
Meder, Benjamin Fliederweg 1 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 05 /
Katus, Hugo Philosophenweg 17 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 06 /
Rottbauer, Wolfgang Lange Lemppen 10 89075 Ulm / DE | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Geling, Andrea ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Geling, Andrea ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/18] | Geling, Andrea ZSP Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14174637.0 | 19.04.2011 | [2015/18] | Priority number, date | US20100326043P | 20.04.2010 Original published format: US 326043 P | EP20100004190 | 20.04.2010 Original published format: EP 10004190 | EP20100185136 | 01.10.2010 Original published format: EP 10185136 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2865765 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2865765 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2015/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Komplexe miRNA-Sätze als neuartige Biomarker für ein akutes Koronarsyndrom | [2015/18] | English: | Complex miRNA sets as novel biomarkers for an acute coronary syndrome | [2015/18] | French: | Ensembles miARN complexes en tant que nouveaux biomarqueurs d'un syndrome coronaire aigu | [2015/18] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 23.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11715666.1 / EP2561091 | Divisional application(s) | EP16182837.1 / EP3124623 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2011 | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | IS | 17.12.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | IE | 19.04.2017 | LU | 19.04.2017 | MT | 19.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.04.2011 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 19.04.2011 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 19.04.2011 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.04.2011 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.08.2016 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009149182 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * sequence 20020 *; | [A]WO2009043353 (SANTARIS PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 93, line 35; sequence 233 *; | [A]WO2009070653 (UNIV OHIO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * table 2 * | [A] - AI J ET AL, "Circulating microRNA-1 as a potential novel biomarker for acute myocardial infarction", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 391, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2009.11.005, ISSN 0006-291X, (20100101), pages 73 - 77, (20091105), XP026907859 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2009.11.005 | [A] - WANG GUO-KUN ET AL, "Circulating microRNA: a novel potential biomarker for early diagnosis of acute myocardial infarction in humans.", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, (201003), vol. 31, no. 6, ISSN 1522-9645, pages 659 - 666, XP002586116 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/EURHEART/EHQ013 | [A] - HOEKSTRA MENNO ET AL, "The peripheral blood mononuclear cell microRNA signature of coronary artery disease", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (20100315), vol. 394, no. 3, pages 792 - 797, XP002586117 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BBRC.2010.03.075 | [A] - TIJSEN ANKE J ET AL, "MiR423-5p as a circulating biomarker for heart failure.", CIRCULATION RESEARCH, (20100402), vol. 106, no. 6, ISSN 1524-4571, pages 1035 - 1039, XP002586118 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Supplementary data Table 1; page 1036, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.110.218297 | [ ] - Tijsen et al., "Supplement material", Circulation Research, (20100402), URL: http://circres.ahajournals.org/cgi/data/CIRCRESAHA.110.218297/DC1/1, (20100608) [ ] * page 9; table 1 * | [ ] - "Sequence 20020 from Patent WO2009149182.", EMBL, (20100114), Database accession no. HC275573, URL: EBI, XP002637609 [ ] * compound . * | [ ] - "Sequence 233 from Patent WO2009043353.", EMBL, (20090507), Database accession no. GN345469, URL: EBI, XP002637608 [ ] * compound . * | by applicant | - AI, BIOCHEM. AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATION, (2010), vol. 391, pages 73 - 77 | - WANG ET AL., EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, (2010), vol. 31, pages 659 - 666 | - PT NELSON ET AL., NATURE METHODS, (2004), vol. 1, no. 2, page 1 | - VORWERK S. ET AL., "Microfluidic based enzymatic on-chip labeling ofmiRNAs", N. BIOTECHNOL., (20080820), vol. 25, no. 2-3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.nbt.2008.08.005, pages 142 - 9, XP025711668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbt.2008.08.005 | - ZHAO Y; SAMAL E; SRIVASTAVA D., "Serum response factor regulates a muscle-specific microRNA that targets Hand2 during cardiogenesis", NATURE, (2005), vol. 436, doi:doi:10.1038/nature03817, pages 214 - 20, XP002396711 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03817 | - DRESIOS J; ASCHRAFI A; OWENS GC; VANDERKLISH PW; EDELMAN GM; MAURO VP, "Cold stress-induced protein Rbm3 binds 60S ribosomal subunits, alters microRNA levels, and enhances global protein synthesis", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (2005), vol. 102, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0409764102, pages 1865 - 70, XP002486928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0409764102 | - XU P; VERNOOY SY; GUO M; HAY BA, "The Drosophila microRNA Mir-14 suppresses cell death and is required for normal fat metabolism", CURR BIOL., (2003), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/S0960-9822(03)00250-1, pages 790 - 5, XP002994326 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(03)00250-1 | - CIMMINO A; CALIN GA; FABBRI M; IORIO MV; FERRACIN M; SHIMIZU M; WOJCIK SE; AQEILAN RI; ZUPO S; DONO M, "miR-15 and miR-16 induce apoptosis by targeting BCL2", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (2005), vol. 102, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0506654102, pages 13944 - 9, XP002484308 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0506654102 | - CALIN GA; GARZON R; CIMMINO A; FABBRI M; CROCE CM, "MicroRNAs and leukemias: how strong is the connection?", LEUK RES., (2006), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1016/j.leukres.2005.10.017, pages 653 - 5, XP025088126 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.leukres.2005.10.017 | - CALIN GA; FERRACIN M; CIMMINO A; DI LEVA G; SHIMIZU M; WOJCIK SE; IORIO MV; VISONE R; SEVER NI; FABBRI M, "A MicroRNA signature associated with prognosis and progression in chronic lymphocytic leukemia", N ENGL J MED., (2005), vol. 353, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa050995, pages 1793 - 801, XP009058593 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa050995 | - LEE RC; FEINBAUM RL; AMBROS V., "The C. elegans heterochronic gene lin-4 encodes small RNAs with antisense complementarity to lin-14", CELL, (1993), vol. 75, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(93)90529-Y, pages 843 - 54, XP024246130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(93)90529-Y | - DONG S; CHENG Y; YANG J; LI J; LIU X; WANG X; WANG D; KRALL TJ; DELPHIN ES; ZHANG C, "MicroRNA expression signature and the role of microRNA-21 in the early phase of acute myocardial infarction", J BIOL CHEM., (2009), vol. 284, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M109.027896, pages 29514 - 25, XP055017446 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M109.027896 | - NEWTON PJ; BETIHAVAS V; MACDONALD P, "The role of b-type natriuretic peptide in heart failure management", AUST CRIT CARE., (2009), vol. 22, pages 117 - 23, XP026447216 | - LAINSCAK M; ANKER MS; VON HAEHLING S; ANKER SD, "Biomarkers for chronic heart failure : diagnostic, prognostic, and therapeutic challenges", HERZ, (2009), vol. 34, pages 589 - 93, XP019782767 | - MANZANO-FERNANDEZ S; BORONAT-GARCIA M; ALBALADEJO-OTON MD; PASTOR P; GARRIDO IP; PASTOR-PEREZ FJ; MARTINEZ-HERNANDEZ P; VALDES M;, "Complementary prognostic value of cystatin C, N-terminal pro-B-type natriuretic Peptide and cardiac troponin T in patients with acute heart failure", AM J CARDIOL., (2009), vol. 103, doi:doi:10.1016/j.amjcard.2009.02.029, pages 1753 - 9, XP026192635 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjcard.2009.02.029 | - KATUS HA; REMPPIS A; LOOSER S; HALLERMEIER K; SCHEFFOLD T; KUBLER W, "Enzyme linked immuno assay of cardiac troponin T for the detection of acute myocardial infarction in patients", J MOL CELL CARDIOL., (1989), vol. 21, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2828(89)90680-9, pages 1349 - 53, XP022998019 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2828(89)90680-9 | - MUKOYAMA M; NAKAO K; SAITO Y; OGAWA Y; HOSODA K; SUGA S; SHIRAKAMI G; JOUGASAKI M; IMURA H, "Increased human brain natriuretic peptide in congestive heart failure", N ENGL J MED., (1990), vol. 323, pages 757 - 8 | - GERSZTEN RE; WANG TJ, "The search for new cardiovascular biomarkers", NATURE, (2008), vol. 451, doi:doi:10.1038/nature06802, pages 949 - 52, XP055033236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature06802 | - GALLEGO-DELGADO J; LAZARO A; OSENDE JI; BARDERAS MG; BLANCO-COLIO LM; DURAN MC; MARTIN-VENTURA JL; VIVANCO F; EGIDO J., "Proteomic approach in the search of new cardiovascular biomarkers", KIDNEY INT SUPPL., (2005), pages 5103 - 7 | - GIANNITSIS E; ROTH HJ; LEITHAUSER RM; SCHERHAG J; BENEKE R; KATUS HA, "New highly sensitivity assay used to measure cardiac troponin T concentration changes during a continuous 216-km marathon", CLIN CHEM., (2009), vol. 55, pages 590 - 2 | - GRIFFITHS-JONES S, "miRBase: the microRNA sequence database", METHODS MOL BIOL., (2006), vol. 342, pages 129 - 38 | - VORWERK S; GANTER K; CHENG Y; HOHEISEL J; STAHLER PF; BEIER M., "Microfluidic-based enzymatic on-chip labeling of miRNAs", N BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/j.nbt.2008.08.005, pages 142 - 9, XP025711668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbt.2008.08.005 | - BENJAMINI Y; HOCHBERG Y, "Controlling the false discovery rate: A practical and powerful approach to multiple testing", J R STATIST SOC B., (1995), vol. 57, pages 289 - 300 | - MEDER B; KATUS HA; ROTTBAUER W., "Right into the heart of microRNA-133a", GENES DEV., (2008), vol. 22, pages 3227 - 31 | - THUM T; GROSS C; FIEDLER J; FISCHER T; KISSLER S; BUSSEN M; GALUPPO P; JUST S; ROTTBAUER W; FRANTZ S, "MicroRNA-21 contributes to myocardial disease by stimulating MAP kinase signalling in fibroblasts", NATURE, (2008), vol. 456, pages 980 - 4 | - CHEN X; BA Y; MA L; CAI X; YIN Y; WANG K; GUO J; ZHANG Y; CHEN J; GUO X, "Characterization ofmicroRNAs in serum: a novel class of biomarkers for diagnosis of cancer and other diseases", CELL RES, (2008), vol. 18, pages 997 - 1006 | - "Risk stratification and survival after myocardial infarction", N ENGL J MED., (1983), vol. 309, pages 331 - 6 | - ROTTBAUER W; GRETEN T; MULLER-BARDORFF M; REMPPIS A; ZEHELEIN J; GRUNIG E; KATUS HA, "Troponin T: a diagnostic marker for myocardial infarction and minor cardiac cell damage", EUR HEART J., (1996), vol. 17, pages 3 - 8, XP000856391 | - KURZ K; SCHILD C; ISFORT P; KATUS HA; GIANNITSIS E, "Serial and single time-point measurements of cardiac troponin T for prediction of clinical outcomes in patients with acute ST-segment elevation myocardial infarction", CLIN RES CARDIOL., (2009), vol. 98, pages 94 - 100, XP019712489 | - TZIVONI D; KOUKOUI D; GUETTA V; NOVACK L; COWING G, "Comparison of Troponin T to creatine kinase and to radionuclide cardiac imaging infarct size in patients with ST-elevation myocardial infarction undergoing primary angioplasty", AM J CARDIOL., (2008), vol. 101, doi:doi:10.1016/j.amjcard.2007.09.119, pages 753 - 7, XP022512468 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjcard.2007.09.119 | - DUISTERS RF; TIJSEN AJ; SCHROEN B; LEENDERS JJ; LENTINK V; VAN DER MADE I; HERIAS V; VAN LEEUWEN RE; SCHELLINGS MW; BARENBRUG P, "miR-133 and miR-30 regulate connective tissue growth factor: implications for a role of microRNAs in myocardial matrix remodeling", CIRC RES., (2009), vol. 104, doi:doi:10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.108.182535, pages 170 - 8, XP008102625 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.108.182535 | - "Risk stratification and survival after myocardial infarction", N ENGL J MED, (1983), vol. 309, pages 331 - 336 | - ADACHI T; NAKANISHI M; OTSUKA Y; NISHIMURA K; HIROKAWA G; GOTO Y; NONOGI H; IWAI N, "Plasma microRNA 499 as a biomarker of acute myocardial infarction", CLIN CHEM, (2010), vol. 56, doi:doi:10.1373/clinchem.2010.144121, pages 1183 - 1185, XP055062403 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2010.144121 | - AI J; ZHANG R; LI Y; PU J; LU Y; JIAO J; LI K; YU B; LI Z; WANG R, "Circulating microRNA-1 as a potential novel biomarker for acute myocardial infarction", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2010), vol. 391, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2009.11.005, pages 73 - 77, XP026907859 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2009.11.005 | - ALIFERIS CF; STATNIKOV A; TSAMARDINOS I; SCHILDCROUT JS; SHEPHERD BE; HARRELL FE, JR., "Factors influencing the statistical power of complex data analysis protocols for molecular signature development from microarray data", PLOS ONE, (2009), vol. 4, page E4922 | - BENJAMINI Y; HOCHBERG Y, "Controlling the false discovery rate: A practical and powerful approach to multiple testing", J R STATIST SOC B, (1995), vol. 57, pages 289 - 300 | - BOSE D; VON BIRGELEN C; ZHOU XY; SCHMERMUND A; PHILIPP S; SACK S; KONORZA T; MOHLENKAMP S; LEINEWEBER K; KLEINBONGARD P, "Impact of atherosclerotic plaque composition on coronary microembolization during percutaneous coronary interventions", BASIC RES CARDIOL, (2008), vol. 103, doi:doi:10.1007/s00395-008-0745-9, pages 587 - 597, XP019656915 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00395-008-0745-9 | - CAI B; PAN Z; LU Y, "The roles of microRNAs in heart diseases: a novel important regulator", CURR MED CHEM, (2010), vol. 17, pages 407 - 411 | - CIMMINO A; CALIN GA; FABBRI M; IORIO MV; FERRACIN M; SHIMIZU M; WOJCIK SE; AQEILAN RI; ZUPO S; DONO M, "miR-15 and miR-16 induce apoptosis by targeting BCL2", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2005), vol. 102, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0506654102, pages 13944 - 13949, XP002484308 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0506654102 | - DONG S; CHENG Y; YANG J; LI J; LIU X; WANG X; WANG D; KRALL TJ; DELPHIN ES; ZHANG C, "MicroRNA expression signature and the role of microRNA-21 in the early phase of acute myocardial infarction", J BIOL CHEM, (2009), vol. 284, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M109.027896, pages 29514 - 29525, XP055017446 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M109.027896 | - DRESIOS J; ASCHRAFI A; OWENS GC; VANDERKLISH PW; EDELMAN GM; MAURO VP, "Cold stress-induced protein Rbm3 binds 60S ribosomal subunits, alters microRNA levels, and enhances global protein synthesis", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), vol. 102, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0409764102, pages 1865 - 1870, XP002486928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0409764102 | - CIRC RES, (2009), vol. 104, pages 170 - 178 | - FLEISSNER F; JAZBUTYTE V; FIEDLER J; GUPTA SK; YIN X; XU Q; GALUPPO P; KNEITZ S; MAYR M; ERTL G, "Short communication: asymmetric dimethylarginine impairs angiogenic progenitor cell function in patients with coronary artery disease through a microRNA-21-dependent mechanism", CIRC RES, (2010), vol. 107, pages 138 - 143 | - GALLEGO-DELGADO J; LAZARO A; OSENDE JI; BARDERAS MG; BLANCO-COLIO LM; DURAN MC; MARTIN-VENTURA JL; VIVANCO F; EGIDO J, "Proteomic approach in the search of new cardiovascular biomarkers", KIDNEY INT, (2005), pages 103 - 107 | - GERSZTEN RE; WANG TJ, "The search for new cardiovascular biomarkers", NATURE, (2008), vol. 451, doi:doi:10.1038/nature06802, pages 949 - 952, XP055033236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature06802 | - GIANNITSIS E; ROTH HJ; LEITHAUSER RM; SCHERHAG J; BENEKE R; KATUS HA, "New highly sensitivity assay used to measure cardiac troponin T concentration changes during a continuous 216-km marathon", CLIN CHEM, (2009), vol. 55, pages 590 - 592 | - GRIFFITHS-JONES S, "miRBase: the microRNA sequence database", METHODS MOL BIOL, (2006), vol. 342, pages 129 - 138 | - HOCHBERG Y, "A sharper bonferroni procedure for multiple tests of significance", BIOMETRICA, (1988), vol. 75, pages 185 - 193 | - HOEKSTRA M; VAN DER LANS CA; HALVORSEN B; GULLESTAD L; KUIPER J; AUKRUST P; VAN BERKEL TJ; BIESSEN EA, "The peripheral blood mononuclear cell microRNA signature of coronary artery disease", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2010), vol. 394, pages 792 - 797 | - JENNEWEIN C; VON KNETHEN A; SCHMID T; BRUNE B, "MicroRNA-27b contributes to lipopolysaccharide-mediated peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor gamma (PPARgamma) mRNA destabilization", J BIOL CHEM, (2010), vol. 285, pages 11846 - 11853 | - KATUS HA; REMPPIS A; LOOSER S; HALLERMEIER K; SCHEFFOLD T; KUBLER W, "Enzyme linked immuno assay of cardiac troponin T for the detection of acute myocardial infarction in patients", J MOL CELL CARDIOL, (1989), vol. 21, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2828(89)90680-9, pages 1349 - 1353, XP022998019 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2828(89)90680-9 | - KONSTANDIN MH; AKSOY H; WABNITZ GH; VOLZ C; ERBEL C; KIRCHGESSNER H; GIANNITSIS E; KATUS HA; SAMSTAG Y; DENGLER TJ, "Beta2-integrin activation on T cell subsets is an independent prognostic factor in unstable angina pectoris", BASIC RES CARDIOL, (2009), vol. 104, pages 341 - 351, XP019712690 | - KURZ K; SCHILD C; ISFORT P; KATUS HA; GIANNITSIS E, "Serial and single time-point measurements of cardiac troponin T for prediction of clinical outcomes in patients with acute ST-segment elevation myocardial infarction", CLIN RES CARDIOL, (2009), vol. 98, pages 94 - 100, XP019712489 | - LAINSCAK M; ANKER MS; VON HAEHLING S; ANKER SD, "Biomarkers for chronic heart failure : diagnostic, prognostic, and therapeutic challenges", HERZ, (2009), vol. 34, pages 589 - 593, XP019782767 | - LEE RC; FEINBAUM RL; AMBROS V, "The C. elegans heterochronic gene lin-4 encodes small RNAs with antisense complementarity to lin-14", CELL, (1993), vol. 75, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(93)90529-Y, pages 843 - 854, XP024246130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(93)90529-Y | - LEIDINGER P; KELLER A; BORRIES A; REICHRATH J; RASS K; JAGER SU; LENHOF HP; MEESE E, "High-throughput miRNA profiling of human melanoma blood samples", BMC CANCER, (2010), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2407-10-262, page 262, XP021075098 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2407-10-262 | - MANZANO-FERNANDEZ S; BORONAT-GARCIA M; ALBALADEJO-OTON MD; PASTOR P; GARRIDO IP; PASTOR-PEREZ FJ; MARTINEZ-HERNANDEZ P; VALDES M;, "Complementary prognostic value of cystatin C, N-terminal pro-B-type natriuretic Peptide and cardiac troponin T in patients with acute heart failure", AM J CARDIOL, (2009), vol. 103, doi:doi:10.1016/j.amjcard.2009.02.029, pages 1753 - 1759, XP026192635 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjcard.2009.02.029 | - MEDER B; KATUS HA; ROTTBAUER W, "Right into the heart of microRNA-133a", GENES DEV, (2008), vol. 22, pages 3227 - 3231 | - MEREDITH D; PANCHATCHARAM M; MIRIYALA S; TSAI YS; MORRIS AJ; MAEDA N, STOUFFER GA; SMYTH SS, "Dominant-negative loss of PPARgamma function enhances smooth muscle cell proliferation, migration, and vascular remodeling", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASE BIOL, (2009), vol. 29, pages 465 - 471 | - MUKOYAMA M; NAKAO K; SAITO Y; OGAWA Y; HOSODA K; SUGA S; SHIRAKAMI G; JOUGASAKI M; IMURA H, "Increased human brain natriuretic peptide in congestive heart failure", N ENGL J MED, (1990), vol. 323, pages 757 - 758 | - NEWTON PJ; BETIHAVAS V; MACDONALD P, "The role of b-type natriuretic peptide in heart failure management", AUST CRIT CARE, (2009), vol. 22, pages 117 - 123, XP026447216 | - PORELA P; PULKKI K; VOIPIO-PULKKI LM; PETTERSSON K; LEPPANEN V; NEVALAINEN TJ, "Level of circulating phospholipase A2 in prediction of the prognosis of patients with suspected myocardial infarction", BASIC RES CARDIOL, (2000), vol. 95, pages 413 - 417 | - ROTTBAUER W; GRETEN T; MULLER-BARDORFFM; REMPPIS A; ZEHELEIN J; GRUNIG E; KATUS HA, "Troponin T: a diagnostic marker for myocardial infarction and minor cardiac cell damage", EUR HEART J, (1996), vol. 17, pages 3 - 8, XP000856391 | - THUM T; GROSS C; FIEDLER J; FISCHER T; KISSLER S; BUSSEN M; GALUPPO P; JUST S; ROTTBAUER W; FRANTZ S, "MicroRNA-21 contributes to myocardial disease by stimulating MAP kinase signalling in fibroblasts.", NATURE, (2008), vol. 456, pages 980 - 984 | - TZIVONI D; KOUKOUI D; GUETTA V; NOVACK L; COWING G, "Comparison of Troponin T to creatine kinase and to radionuclide cardiac imaging infarct size in patients with ST-elevation myocardial infarction undergoing primary angioplasty", AM J CARDIOL, (2008), vol. 101, doi:doi:10.1016/j.amjcard.2007.09.119, pages 753 - 757, XP022512468 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjcard.2007.09.119 | - VOELLENKLE C; VAN ROOIJ J; CAPPUZZELLO C; GRECO S; ARCELLI D; DI VITO L; MELILLO G; RIGOLINI R; COSTA E; CREA F, "MicroRNA signatures in peripheral blood mononuclear cells of chronic heart failure patients", PHYSIOL GENOMICS, (2010), vol. 42, doi:doi:10.1152/physiolgenomics.00211.2009, pages 420 - 426, XP008133127 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/physiolgenomics.00211.2009 | - VORWERK S; GANTER K; CHENG Y; HOHEISEL J; STAHLER PF; BEIER M, "Microfluidic-based enzymatic on-chip labeling of miRNAs", N BIOTECHNOL, (2008), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/j.nbt.2008.08.005, pages 142 - 149, XP025711668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbt.2008.08.005 | - WANG GK; ZHU JQ; ZHANG JT; LI Q; LI Y; HE J; QIN YW; JING Q, "Circulating microRNA: a novel potential biomarker for early diagnosis of acute myocardial infarction in humans", EUR HEART J, (2010), vol. 31, doi:doi:10.1093/EURHEART/EHQ013, pages 659 - 666, XP002586116 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/EURHEART/EHQ013 | - XIN M; SMALL EM; SUTHERLAND LB; QI X; MCANALLY J; PLATO CF; RICHARDSON JA; BASSEL-DUBY R; OLSON EN, "MicroRNAs miR-143 and miR-145 modulate cytoskeletal dynamics and responsiveness of smooth muscle cells to injury", GENES DEV, (2009), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1101/gad.1842409, pages 2166 - 2178, XP008116941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.1842409 | - XU P; VERNOOY SY; GUO M; HAY BA, "The Drosophila microRNA Mir-14 suppresses cell death and is required for normal fat metabolism", CURR BIOL, (2003), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/S0960-9822(03)00250-1, pages 790 - 795, XP002994326 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(03)00250-1 | - ZHAO Y; SAMAL E; SRIVASTAVA D, "Serum response factor regulates a muscle-specific microRNA that targets Hand2 during cardiogenesis", NATURE, (2005), vol. 436, doi:doi:10.1038/nature03817, pages 214 - 220, XP002396711 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03817 |