EP2787043 - USE OF ORGANOGELATOR DERIVATIVES IN BITUMINOUS COMPOSITIONS TO IMPROVE THE RESISTANCE THEREOF TO CHEMICAL ATTACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/41] | Use of organogelling agents in bituminous compositions in order to improve the resistance thereof to chemical attacks | ||
[2017/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL MARKETING SERVICES 24, Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lapalu, Laurence 3, rue Georges Courteline 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
Chaminand, Julien 167A avenue Roger Salengro 69120 Vaulx en Velin / FR | 03 /
Vincent, Régis 25 Lotissement les Gruizards 69520 Grigny / FR | 04 /
Harders, Sylvia Am Wall 3 25712 Buchholz / DE | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/41] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14175170.1 | 30.04.2010 | [2014/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2787043 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2787043 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08K5/00, C08K5/25, C08K5/092, C08K5/06, C08K5/21, C08K5/20, C08K5/1575 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/1575 (EP,US);
C08K5/20 (EP,US);
C08L2555/50 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/1575, C08L95/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/20, C08L95/00 (US,EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Title | German: | EINSATZ VON ORGANOGEL-BILDENDEN DERIVATEN IN BITUMINÖSEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG IHRER WIDERSTANDSKRAFT GEGEN CHEMISCHE AGGRESSIONEN | [2017/48] | English: | USE OF ORGANOGELATOR DERIVATIVES IN BITUMINOUS COMPOSITIONS TO IMPROVE THE RESISTANCE THEREOF TO CHEMICAL ATTACKS | [2017/47] | French: | UTILISATION DE DÉRIVÉS ORGANOGELATEURS DANS DES COMPOSITIONS BITUMINEUSES POUR AMÉLIORER LEUR RÉSISTANCE AUX AGRESSIONS CHIMIQUES | [2017/47] |
Former [2014/41] | Einsatz von Organogelbildner-Derivaten in bituminösen Zusammensetzungen zur Verbesserung ihrer Widerstandskraft gegen chemische Aggressionen | ||
Former [2014/41] | Use of organogelling agents in bituminous compositions in order to improve the resistance thereof to chemical attacks | ||
Former [2014/41] | Utilisation de dérivés organogelateurs dans des compositions bitumeuses pour améliorer leur résistance aux agressions chimiques | Examination procedure | 01.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 07.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10161698.5 / EP2386606 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2010 | AT | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | DK | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | ES | 21.03.2018 | FI | 21.03.2018 | HR | 21.03.2018 | IT | 21.03.2018 | LT | 21.03.2018 | LV | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | MK | 21.03.2018 | MT | 21.03.2018 | NL | 21.03.2018 | PL | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | SE | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | SM | 21.03.2018 | TR | 21.03.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | IE | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | LU | 30.04.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | NO | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | IS | 21.07.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MK | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO0216499 (BP OIL INT [GB], et al) [XD] 1,5-10,12 * page 1, line 16 - page 2, line 1 * * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 25; claim - *; | [X]WO0226889 (KRATON POLYMERS RES BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 1, lines 2-7 * * page 2, line 30 - page 10, line 12; example -; claim - *; | [AD]WO2005105926 (TOTAL FRANCE [FR], et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 1, lines 5-7 * * page 3, line 28 - page 17, line 21; claim - *; | [A]WO2006087475 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1, lines 6-22 * * page 3, line 22 - page 15, line 15; example -; claim - *; | [IDA]WO2008107551 (TOTAL FRANCE [FR], et al) [ID] 1-3,5-12 * page 1, lines 5-13 * * page 2, line 31 - page 19, line 2; example 1; claim - * [A] 4; | [A]WO2009101275 (UNIV PARIS CURIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1, lines 5-13 * * page 2, line 25 - page 20, line 22; example -; claim - *; | [E]WO2011051913 (TOTAL RAFFINAGE MARKETING [FR], et al) [E] 1,5-12 * page 1, lines 7-12 ** page 2, line 24 - page 15, line 18; example -; claim - *; | [A] - ISARE B ET AL, "The weak help the strong: Low-molar-mass organogelators harden bitumen", COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (20090804), Database accession no. E20100512675949, XP002597137 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [ ] - LANGMUIR 20090804 AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY USA, (20090804), vol. 25, no. 15, doi:10.1021/LA804086H, pages 8400 - 8403, XP002597138 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la804086h | Examination | WO2007012665 | - HWANG ET AL, "Geochemical comparison of reservoir solid bitumens with diverse origins", ORGANIC GEOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980101), vol. 29, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0146-6380(98)00078-3, ISSN 0146-6380, pages 505 - 517, XP005812732 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0146-6380(98)00078-3 | by applicant | EP0900253 | EP1311619 | EP1572807 | EP1756228 | WO2008107551 |