EP2786754 - Combination therapy with a mitotic inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/41] | Combination therapy with an antitumor alkaloid | ||
[2018/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharma Mar S.A. Avda. de los Reyes, 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte 28770 Colmenar Viejo Madrid / ES | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONEO OCAÑA, Victoria Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte 28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | 02 /
GARCÍA FERNÁNDEZ, Luis Francisco Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte 28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | 03 /
GALMARINI, Carlos María Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte 28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | 04 /
GUILLÉN NAVARRO, María José Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte 28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | 05 /
AVILÉS MARÍN, Pablo Manuel Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte 28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | 06 /
SANTAMARÍA NÚÑEZ, Gema Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte 28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | [2018/39] |
Former [2014/41] | 01 /
Moneo Ocana, Victoria Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
Garcia Fernandez, Luis Francisco Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | |||
03 /
Galmarini, Carlos María Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | |||
04 /
Guillen Navarro, María José Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | |||
05 /
Aviles Marin, Pablo Manuel Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | |||
06 /
Santamaria Nunez, Gema Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo- Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | ABG Intellectual Property, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2014/41] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 14175268.3 | 11.11.2011 | [2014/41] | Priority number, date | EP20100382300 | 12.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10382300 | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2786754 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2786754 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2786754 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4995, A61K31/513, A61K31/519, A61K31/69, A61K31/7068, A61K38/15, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61K31/337, A61K31/475 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/4995 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/34 (RU);
A61K31/395 (RU);
A61K31/4164 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4188 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4375 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/69 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,KR,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/15 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4995, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/69, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2014/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 28.04.2015 | ME | 28.04.2015 | Title | German: | Kombinationstherapie mit einem Mitosehemmer | [2018/19] | English: | Combination therapy with a mitotic inhibitor | [2018/19] | French: | Thérapie de combinaison avec un inhibiteur de la mitose | [2018/19] |
Former [2014/41] | Kombinationstherapie mit einem antitumoralen Alkaloid | ||
Former [2014/41] | Combination therapy with an antitumor alkaloid | ||
Former [2014/41] | Thérapie de combinaison avec un alcaloïde antitumoral | Examination procedure | 28.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 18.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11781807.0 / EP2637663 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/31] | AL | 09.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1806349 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES]) [A] 1-10 * p. 19, compound 27; paragraph [0037] *; | [A]WO2009140675 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 10 *; | [XPI] - José Guillén ET AL, "In vivo combination studies of PM01183 with alkylating, antimetabolites, DNA-topoisomerase inhibitors and tubulin binding agents", (20110405), URL: http://www.abstractsonline.com/Plan/ViewAbstract.aspx?sKey=17ec9ca9-693a-4df8-8e8c-857ab3e72dc7&cKey=09c40d0f-78d3-44d9-bac5-c1117328e5c6&mKey={507D311A-B6EC-436A-BD67-6D14ED39622C}, (20120307), XP055021187 [XP] 1,2,6-10 * the whole document * [I] 3-5 | [A] - JFM LEAL ET AL, "PM01183, a new DNA minor groove covalent binder with potent in vitro and in vivo anti-tumour activity", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (20100702), vol. 161, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1476-5381.2010.00945.x, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1099 - 1110, XP055013260 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1476-5381.2010.00945.x | [A] - SCHMIDT ET AL, "Mitotic drug targets and the development of novel anti-mitotic anticancer drugs", DRUG RESISTANCE UPDATES, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, EDINBURGH, GB, (20070801), vol. 10, no. 4-5, doi:10.1016/J.DRUP.2007.06.003, ISSN 1368-7646, pages 162 - 181, XP022254898 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.drup.2007.06.003 | [T] - Maria José Guillén, "Lurbinectedin (PM01183) in vivo synergizes the antitumor activity of taxanes", Cancer Research: April 15, 2013; Volume 73, Issue 8, Supplement 1, (10130409), URL: http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/cgi/content/short/73/8_MeetingAbstracts/5495, (20140912), XP055140010 [T] * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0187894 | WO03001427 | WO03014127 | WO2004035613 | WO2006046079 | - LEAL JFM ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., (2010), vol. 161, pages 1099 - 1110 | - CHOU T.C., PHARMACOL. REV., (2006), vol. 58, pages 621 - 681 | - CHOU; TALALAY, ADV. ENZYME REGUL., (1984), vol. 22, pages 27 - 55 |