EP2963885 - A client-server-communication system running a client-side-script-program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOB GmbH & Co. KG Schwadermühlstrasse 3 90556 Cadolzburg / DE | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Stefan Weißenseer Weg 12 99610 Tunzenhausen / DE | 02 /
Rettner, Alexander Schreiberstraße 3 90763 Fürth / DE | 03 /
Brandstätter, Klaus Hasensprung 16 90574 Rosstal / DE | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14175590.0 | 03.07.2014 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2963885 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G06F17/30 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2016/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Client-Server-Kommunikationssystem mit clientseitigem Skriptprogramm | [2016/01] | English: | A client-server-communication system running a client-side-script-program | [2016/01] | French: | Système de communication client-serveur exécutant un programme de script du côté client | [2016/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 23.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006124215 (CUSTOM CREDIT SYSTEMS L P [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 6 * * page 3, line 22 - page 3, line 25 * * page 4, line 19 - page 4, line 31 * * page 5, line 14 - page 5, line 28 *; | [A] - BOULOS MAGED N KAMEL ET AL, "Web GIS in practice VIII: HTML5 and the canvas element for interactive online mapping", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HEALTH GEOGRAPHICS, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON, GB, (20100303), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1476-072X, page 14, XP021067927 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - Keaton Mowery ET AL, "Pixel Perfect: Fingerprinting Canvas in HTML5", Proceedings of Web 2.0 Security & Privacy Workshop (W2SP), San Francisco, CA, USA, (20120524), URL: http://w2spconf.com/2012/papers/w2sp12-final4.pdf, (20140723), XP055131271 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |