EP2792677 - Novel compound useful for the treatment of degenerative and inflammatory diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galapagos NV Generaal De Wittelaan L11/A3 2800 Mechelen / BE | [2016/51] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Galapagos N.V. Generaal de Wittelaan L11 A3 2800 Mechelen / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanc, Javier c/o Galapagos N.V Generaal De Wittelaan L11/A3 2800 Mechelen / BE | 02 /
Menet, Christel Jeanne Marie c/o Galapagos N.V Generaal De Wittelaan L11/A3 2800 Mechelen / BE | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14175887.0 | 25.06.2010 | [2014/43] | Priority number, date | US20090220685P | 26.06.2009 Original published format: US 220685 P | US20100298188P | 25.01.2010 Original published format: US 298188 P | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2792677 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2792677 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2014/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Neuartige Verbindung zur Behandlung von Degenerations- und Entzündungskrankheiten | [2014/43] | English: | Novel compound useful for the treatment of degenerative and inflammatory diseases | [2014/43] | French: | Nouveaux composés utiles pour le traitement de maladies inflammatoires et dégénératives | [2014/43] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 15.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10728648.6 / EP2445912 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008025821 (CELLZOME UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [I]WO2009017954 (PHENOMIX CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 3 * * compounds 15-18 * * claim 1 * | by applicant | US6500854 | EP1391211 | WO2005124342 | - O'SULLIVAN ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 44, no. 10, pages 2497 - 506 | - CONSTANTINESCU ET AL., TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES, (2007), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 122 - 131 | - TAM, BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2007), vol. 97, pages 378 - 383 | - TETSUJI NAKA; NORIHIRO NISHIMOTO; TADAMITSU KISHIMOTO, ARTHRITIS RES, (2002), vol. 4, no. 3, pages S233 - S242 | - BUNDGARD, H., Design of Prodrugs, ELSEVIER, (1985), pages 7 - 9,21-24 | - DAVID D BRAND; KARY A LATHAM; EDWARD F ROSLONIEC, "Collagen-induced arthritis", NATURE METHODS, (2007), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 1269 - 1275 | - SIMS NA ET AL., "Targeting osteoclasts with zoledronic acid prevents bone destruction in collagen-induced arthritis", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2004), vol. 50, pages 2338 - 2346 | - KACHIGIAN LM., NATURE PROTOCOLS, (2006), pages 2512 - 2516 | - WERNIG ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2008), vol. 13, page 311 | - GERON ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2008), vol. 13, page 321 | - ARGILES JM; LOPEZ-SORIANO FJ, "Catabolic proinflammatory cytokines", CURR OPIN CLIN NUTR METAB CARE, (1998), vol. 1, pages 245 - 51 | - BUSH KA; FARMER KM; WALKER JS; KIRKHAM BW, "Reduction of joint inflammation and bone erosion in rat adjuvant arthritis by treatment with interleukin-17 receptor IgG Fc fusion protein", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2002), vol. 46, doi:doi:10.1002/art.10173, pages 802 - 5, XP055052442 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.10173 | - CHOY EH; PANAYI GS, N ENGL J MED., (2001), vol. 344, pages 907 - 16 | - CHUBINSKAYA S; KUETTNER KE, "Regulation of osteogenic proteins by chondrocytes", THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY & CELL BIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 1323 - 1340 | - CLEGG DO ET AL., "Glucosamine, chondroitin sulfate, and the two in combination for painful knee osteoarthritis", N ENGL J MED., (2006), vol. 354, pages 795 - 808 | - FIRESTEIN GS, NATURE, (2003), vol. 423, pages 356 - 61 | - GERON ET AL., "Selective inhibition of JAK2-driven erythroid differentiation of polycythemia vera progenitors", CANCER CELL, (2008), vol. 13, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ccr.2008.02.017, pages 321 - 30, XP009165137 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2008.02.017 | - IP ET AL., "Interleukin (IL)-4 and IL-13 up-regulate monocyte chemoattractant protein- expression in human bronchial epithelial cells: involvement of p38 mitogen-activated protein kinase, extracellular signal-regulated kinase 1/2 and Janus kinase-2 but not c-Jun NH2-terminal kinase 1/ 2 signalling pathways", CLIN. EXP. IMMUN, (2006), pages 162 - 172 | - JOU IM; SHIAU AL; CHEN SY; WANG CR; SHIEH DB; TSAI CS; WU CL, "Thrombospondin 1 as an effective gene therapeutic strategy in collagen-induced arthritis", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2005), vol. 52, pages 339 - 44 | - KACHIGIAN LM., "Collagen antibody-induced arthritis", NATURE PROTOCOLS, (2006), pages 2512 - 2516 | - KHACHIGIAN, L. M., "Collagen antibody-induced arthritis", NATURE PROTOCOLS, (2006), vol. 1, pages 2512 - 6 | - KUDLACZ ET AL., "The JAK-3 inhibitor CP-690550 is a potent anti-inflammatory agent in a murine model of pulmonary eosinophilia", EUR J PHARMACO, (2008), pages 154 - 161 | - LEE DM; WEINBLATT ME, LANCET, (2001), vol. 358, pages 903 - 11 | - LEGENDRE F; DUDHIA J; PUJOL J-P; BOGDANOWICZ P, "JAK/STAT but not ERKl/ERK2 pathway mediates interleuking (IL)-6/soluble IL-6R down-regulation of type II collagen, aggrecan core, and link protein transcription in articular chondrocytes", J BIOL CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 5, pages 2903 - 2912 | - LI WQ; DEHNADE F; ZAFARULLAH M, "Oncostatin M-induced matrix metalloproteinase and tissue inhibitor of metalloproteinase-3 genes expression in chondrocytes requires janus kinase/STAT signaling pathway", J IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 166, pages 3491 - 3498 | - LIN HS; HU CY; CHAN HY; LIEW YY; HUANG HP; LEPESCHEUX L; BASTIANELLI E; BARON R; RAWADI G; CLÉMENT-LACROIX P, "Anti-rheumatic activities of histone deacetylase (HDAC) inhibitors in vivo in collagen-induced arthritis in rodents", BR J PHARMACOL., (200704), vol. 150, no. 7, pages 829 - 31 | - NIALS ET AL., "Mouse Models of Allergic Asthma: Acute and Chronic Allergen Challenge, Disease Models & Mechanisms", MOUSE MODELS OF ALLERGIC ASTHMA: ACUTE AND CHRONIC ALLERGEN CHALLENGE, DISEASE MODELS & MECHANISMS, (2008), pages 213 - 220 | - NISHIDA K; KOMIYAMA T; MIYAZAWA S; SHEN ZN; FURUMATSU T; DOI H; YOSHIDA A; YAMANA J; YAMAMURA M; NINOMIYA Y, "Histone deacetylase inhibitor suppression of autoantibody-mediated arthritis in mice via regulation of p l6INK4a and p2l(WAFl/Cip ) expression", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2004), vol. 10, pages 3365 - 76 | - O'SHEA, J.J.; PESU, M.; BORIE, D.C.; CHANGELIAN, P.S., NATURE REVIEWS, (2004), pages 555 - 564 | - O'DELL JR, "Therapeutic strategies for rheumatoid arthritis", N ENGL J MED., (2004), vol. 350, no. 25, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMra040226, pages 2591 - 602, XP002503052 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMra040226 | - OSAKI M; TAN L; CHOY BK; YOSHIDA Y; CHEAH KSE; AURON PE; GOLDRING MB, "The TATA-conatining core promoter of the type II collagen gene (COL2A1) is the target of interferon-gamma-mediated inhibition in human chondrocytes: requirement for STAT1 alpha, JAK1 and JAK2", BIOCHEM J, (2003), vol. 369, pages 103 - 115 | - OTERO M; LAGO R; LAGO F; GOMEZ REINO JJ; GUALILLO O, "Signalling pathway involved in nitric oxide synthase type II activation in chondrocytes: synergistic effect of leptin with interleukin-1", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH & THERAPY, (2005), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1186/ar1708, pages R581 - R591, XP021011597 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar1708 | - PERNIS ET AL., "JAK-STAT signaling in asthma", J. CLIN. INVEST., (2002), page 1279 | - RALL LC; ROUBENOFF R, "Rheumatoid cachexia: metabolic abnormalities, mechanisms and interventions", RHEUMATOLOGY, (2004), vol. 10, pages 1219 - 23 | - RODIG SJ; MERAZ MA; WHITE JM; LAMPE PA; RILEY JK; ARTHUR CD; KING KL; SHEEHAN KCF; YIN L; PENNICA D, "Disruption of the Jakl gene demonstrates obligatory and nonredundant roles of the jaks in cytokine-induced biologic responses", CELL, (1998), vol. 93, pages 373 - 383 | - SALVEMINI D; MAZZON E; DUGO L; SERRAINO I; DE SARRO A; CAPUTI AP; CUZZOCREA S, "Amelioration of joint disease in a rat model of collagen-induced arthritis by M40403, a superoxide dismutase mimetic", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2001), vol. 44, pages 2909 - 21 | - SHELTON DL; ZELLER J; HO WH; PONS J; ROSENTHAL A, "Nerve growth factor mediates hyperalgesia and cachexia in auto-immune arthritis", PAIN, (2005), vol. 116, doi:doi:10.1016/j.pain.2005.03.039, pages 8 - 16, XP004944203 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pain.2005.03.039 | - SIMS NA; GREEN JR; GLATT M; SCHLICT S; MARTIN TJ; GILLESPIE MT; ROMAS E, "Targeting osteoclasts with zoledronic acid prevents bone destruction in collagen-induced arthritis", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2004), vol. 50, pages 2338 - 46 | - SMOLEN JS; STEINER G, NAT REV DRUG DISCOV., (2003), vol. 2, pages 473 - 88 | - TAM, L.; MCGLYNN, L.M.; TRAYNOR, P.; MUKHERJEE, R.; BARTLETT, J.M.S.; EDWARDS, J., BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2007), vol. 97, pages 378 - 383 | - TETSUJI NAKA; NORIHIRO NISHIMOTO; TADAMITSU KISHIMOTO, ARTHRITIS RES, (2002), vol. 4, no. SUPPL, pages S233 - S242 | - WALSMITH J; ABAD L; KEHAYIAS J; ROUBENOFF R, "Tumor necrosis factor-alpha production is associated with less body cell mass in women with rheumatoid arthritis", J RHEUMATOL., (2004), vol. 31, pages 23 - 9 | - WERNIG ET AL., "Efficacy of TG101348, a selective JAK2 inhibitor, in treatment of a murine model of JAK2V617F-induced polycythemia vera", CANCER CELL, (2008), vol. 13, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ccr.2008.02.009, pages 311 - 320, XP008146592 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2008.02.009 | - WIELAND HA; MICHAELIS M; KIRSCHBAUM BJ; RUDOLPHI KA, "Osteoarthritis - an untreatable disease?", NAT REV DRUG DISCOV., (2005), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd1693, pages 331 - 44, XP055038228 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd1693 | - WIRTZ ET AL., "Mouse Models of Inflammatory Bowel Disease", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEW, (2007), doi:doi:10.1016/j.addr.2007.07.003, pages 1073 - 1083, XP022312888 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2007.07.003 | - MCGINNITY, D.F., "Evaluation of fresh and cryopreserved hepatocytes as in vitro drug metabolism tools for the prediction of metabolic clearance", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, (2004), vol. 32, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1124/dmd.104.000026, page 1247, XP055214779 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/dmd.104.000026 |