EP2835577 - Lighting apparatus with zooming function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | [2015/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deng, Hong Kunshan Free Trade Zone Waihejing Road 199 215300 Kunshan / CN | 02 /
Rehn, Henning Klenzepfad 20 13407 Berlin / DE | [2015/07] | Application number, filing date | 14177144.4 | 15.07.2014 | [2015/07] | Priority number, date | CN20131344175 | 08.08.2013 Original published format: CN201310344175 | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2835577 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F21V5/04, F21V7/04, F21V14/02, // F21Y101/02, F21W131/406 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
F21V5/048 (EP,CN,US);
F21V14/02 (EP,CN,US);
F21V7/041 (EP,CN,US);
F21V7/048 (EP,CN,US);
G03B15/06 (US);
F21W2131/406 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung mit Zoomfunktion | [2015/07] | English: | Lighting apparatus with zooming function | [2015/07] | French: | Appareil d'éclairage avec fonction zoom | [2015/07] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 12.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 12.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]KR20120140353 (LEE WHA LANG [KR]) [X] 1,4,5,8,9 * figures 1, 2, 4 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 23] - [0031] * * claim 1 * [Y] 2,3,6,7; | [X]KR20110043812 (KOREA PHOTONICS TECH INST [KR]) [X] 1,4,8,9 * figures 6-9 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0042] - [0 50] - [0054] - [0 59] - [0068] *; | [Y]WO2012032455 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figure 2 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 24 *; | [IY]WO2006136388 (ARNOLD & RICHTER KG [DE], et al) [I] 1,4,5 * figures 1, 2, 5a, 5b * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 45] - [0050] * * claim 1 * [Y] 6,7; | [I]DE102004046389 (BRUGGAIER CHRISTOPH F [DE]) [I] 1,4,8,9 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 15] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0046] - [0050] , [0 51] *; | [I]WO0136871 (MORPHEUS TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [I] 1 * figures 4, 5 * * page 2, lines 2-21 * * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 18 * |