Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019250467 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414303843 | 13.06.2014 | US201916392583 | 23.04.2019 | KR20130087491 | 24.07.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10317734 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2019 | B2 | US2015029455 | 29.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130087491 | 24.07.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102069822B | Global Dossier | 28.01.2020 | B1 | KR20150012093 | 03.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130087491 | 24.07.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6348360B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2018 | B2 | JP2015026074 | 05.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130087491 | 24.07.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104345498B | Global Dossier | 22.10.2019 | B | CN104345498 | 11.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130087491 | 24.07.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2829909 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2016 | B1 | EP2829909 | 28.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130087491 | 24.07.2013 |