17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
06.07.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
28.07.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
25.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.06.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.08.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
05.08.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
26.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.01.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |