Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9804567 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2017 | B2 | US2016252881 | 01.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14178104 | 23.07.2014 | WO2015EP63816 | 19.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6244456B | Global Dossier | 06.12.2017 | B2 | JP2016533492 | 27.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14178104 | 23.07.2014 | WO2015EP63816 | 19.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105706005B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2017 | B | CN105706005 | 22.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14178104 | 23.07.2014 | WO2015EP63816 | 19.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2688847 | 22.05.2019 | C2 | RU2017105855 | 25.04.2019 | A3 | RU2017105855 | 27.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14178104 | 23.07.2014 | WO2015EP63816 | 19.06.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016012166 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2016 | A3 | WO2016012166 | 28.01.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP14178104 | 23.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2977830 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2017 | B1 | EP2977830 | 27.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14178104 | 23.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1225817 | 15.09.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | EP14178104 | 23.07.2014 |