EP2977931 - Method for tracking keypoints in a scene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Zürich Rämistrasse 71 8006 Zürich / CH | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brändli, Christian St. Georgstr. 6 5400 Baden / CH | 02 /
Osswald, Marc Schaffhauserstr. 199 8057 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Delbrück, Tobias Winkelriedstr. 34 8006 Zürich / CH | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Großbeerenstraße 71 10963 Berlin / DE | [2016/04] | Application number, filing date | 14178447.0 | 24.07.2014 | [2016/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2977931 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/20, G06K9/60, G06K9/62, G06T7/20, G06K9/46 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
G06T7/248 (EP,KR,US);
G06V10/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06V10/462 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F18/25 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T7/73 (KR,US);
G06V10/80 (EP,KR,US);
G06V20/40 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verfolgung von Schlüsselpunkten in einer Szene | [2016/04] | English: | Method for tracking keypoints in a scene | [2016/04] | French: | Procédé de suivi de points clés dans une scène | [2016/04] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 06.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA] - CENSI ANDREA ET AL, "Low-latency event-based visual odometry", 2014 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA), IEEE, (20140531), doi:10.1109/ICRA.2014.6906931, pages 703 - 710, XP032650286 [I] 1,2,6,7,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,8-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICRA.2014.6906931 | [A] - WEIKERSDORFER DAVID ET AL, "Event-based 3D SLAM with a depth-augmented dynamic vision sensor", 2014 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA), IEEE, (20140531), doi:10.1109/ICRA.2014.6906882, pages 359 - 364, XP032650768 [A] 3-5,8-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICRA.2014.6906882 | by applicant | US6711293 | US2008135731 | US2009238460 | - BERNER, R.; BRANDLI, C.; YANG, M.; LIU, S.-C.; DELBRUCK, T., "A 240 x 180 10mW 12us Latency Sparse-Output Vision Sensor for Mobile Applications", 2013 SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI CIRCUITS (VLSIC). PRESENTED AT THE 2013 SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI CIRCUITS (VLSIC, (2013), pages C186 - C187 | - CALONDER, M.; LEPETIT, V.; STRECHA, C.; FUA, P., "BRIEF: Binary Robust Independent Elementary Features", CALONDER, M.; LEPETIT, V.; STRECHA, C.; FUA, P., DANIILIDIS, K., MARAGOS, P., PARAGIOS, N., Computer Vision - ECCV 2010, Lecture Notes in Computer Science, SPRINGER, (2010), pages 778 - 792, XP019150781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-15561-1_56 | - CANNY, J., "A Computational Approach to Edge Detection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE PAMI-8, (1986), doi:doi:10.1109/TPAMI.1986.4767851, pages 679 - 698, XP000604891 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.1986.4767851 | - LEUTENEGGER, S.; CHLI, M.; SIEGWART, R.Y., "BRISK: Binary Robust invariant scalable keypoints", 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION (ICCV). PRESENTED AT THE 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION (ICCV, (2011), doi:doi:10.1109/ICCV.2011.6126542, pages 2548 - 2555, XP055137182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2011.6126542 | - MAIR, E.; HAGER, G.D.; BURSCHKA, D.; SUPPA, M.; HIRZINGER, G., "Adaptive and Generic Corner Detection Based on the Accelerated Segment Test", MAIR, E.; HAGER, G.D.; BURSCHKA, D.; SUPPA, M.; HIRZINGER, G., DANIILIDIS, K., MARAGOS, P., PARAGIOS, N., Computer Vision - ECCV 2010, Lecture Notes in Computer Science, SPRINGER, (2010), pages 183 - 196, XP019150564 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-15552-9_14 | - ROSTEN, E.; DRUMMOND, T., "Machine Learning for High-Speed Corner Detection", ROSTEN, E.; DRUMMOND, T., LEONARDIS, A., BISCHOF, H., PINZ, A., Computer Vision - ECCV 2006, Lecture Notes in Computer Science, SPRINGER, (2006), pages 430 - 443, XP019036410 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11744023_34 | WO2012EP76093 |