EP2799553 - Process for fermenting sugars containing oligomeric saccharides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | [2020/31] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beacom, Daniel R 16993 76th Avenue N Maple Grove, MN Minnesota MN 55311 / US | 02 /
Kolstad, Jeffrey L 16122 Ringer Road Wayzata, MN Minnesota MN 55391 / US | 03 /
Reeder, David H 6501 Troendle Circle Chanhassen, MN Minnesota MN 55317 / US | 04 /
Rush, Brian J 3336 Emerson Avenue S Minneapolis, MN Minnesota MN 55408 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/45] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 14178495.9 | 16.03.2005 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | US20040558266P | 31.03.2004 Original published format: US 558266 P | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2799553 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2799553 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2799553 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/04, C12P19/16, C12P19/20, C12P19/02, C12P7/56 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C12P7/56 (EP,US);
C12P19/02 (EP,US);
C12P19/04 (EP,US);
C12P19/16 (EP,US);
C12P19/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2014/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vergärung von Zuckern mit oligomeren Sacchariden | [2014/45] | English: | Process for fermenting sugars containing oligomeric saccharides | [2014/45] | French: | Procédé de fermentation de sucres contenant des saccharides oligomériques | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 22.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05725774.3 / EP1756292 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2005 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | ES | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | IT | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | PL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | GB | 16.03.2021 | IE | 16.03.2021 | LU | 16.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
GB | 16.03.2021 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
GB | 16.03.2021 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
GB | 16.03.2021 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5827720 (MINAMIHARA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03095659 (PURAC BIOCHEM BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003215931 (SAHA BADAL C [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A] - MONTESINOS T ET AL, "Role of the maltose in the simultaneous-saccharification-fermentation process from raw wheat starch and Saccharomyces cerevisiae", BIOPROCESS ENGINEERING, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (20000101), vol. 23, doi:10.1007/S004499900136, ISSN 0178-515X, pages 319 - 322, XP003004912 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004499900136 | [A] - HUANG S Y ET AL, "Ethanol production in simultaneous saccharification and fermentation of cellulose with temperature profiling", JOURNAL OF FERMENTATION TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, JP, vol. 66, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0385-6380(88)90083-0, ISSN 0385-6380, (19880101), pages 509 - 516, (19880101), XP025706093 [A] 1-9 * page 510 - page 511 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0385-6380(88)90083-0 | by applicant | WO9914335 | WO0071738 | WO0242471 |