EP2978146 - Modulation codée résistante aux glissements de cycle pour des communications par fibres optiques [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xieon Networks S.à r.l. 6, route de Trèves 2633 Senningerberg / LU | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stefano Calabro Neufriedenheimer Str. 68a 81375 Munich / DE | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | Lucke, Andreas, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14178516.2 | 25.07.2014 | [2016/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2978146 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/548, H04B10/61 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
H04B10/548 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/0055 (US);
H03M13/2792 (US);
H03M13/2927 (US);
H03M13/3905 (US);
H03M13/45 (US);
H04B10/5161 (US);
H04B10/612 (EP,CN,US);
H04B10/6165 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/0041 (US);
H04L1/0058 (US);
H04L1/0071 (US);
H04J14/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Cycle-Slip-resistente, codierte Modulation zur faseroptischen Kommunikation | [2016/04] | English: | Modulation codée résistante aux glissements de cycle pour des communications par fibres optiques | [2016/04] | French: | Modulation codée résistante aux glissements de cycle pour des communications par fibres optiques | [2016/04] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 31.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2506516 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1-7,10-13 * paragraphs [0177] , [0185]; figure 13; claim 1 * * paragraph [0113]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0141] * * paragraphs [0138] , [0144]; figure 1 * [Y] 8,9,14,15; | [A]EP2538596 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [Y]US8656245 (HAMKINS JON [US]) [Y] 8,9,14,15 * figure 3 *; | [A] - LEONI PAOLO ET AL, "Constellation Expansion for Differentially Encoded 100G Transmission", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 26, no. 11, doi:10.1109/LPT.2014.2313457, ISSN 1041-1135, (20140601), pages 1142 - 1145, (20140507), XP011547525 [A] 1,8,10,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2014.2313457 | [A] - SHAOLIANG ZHANG ET AL, "Pilot-Assisted Decision-Aided Maximum-Likelihood Phase Estimation in Coherent Optical Phase-Modulated Systems With Nonlinear Phase Noise", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20100315), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 380 - 382, XP011299655 [A] 1,8,10,14 * the whole document * | [A] - YOSHIDA TSUYOSHI ET AL, "Cycle Slip Compensation with Polarization Block Coding for Coherent Optical Transmission: Two-Dimensional Phases Constellation Corresponds to a Slip State", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 31, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MSP.2013.2290326, ISSN 1053-5888, (20140301), pages 57 - 69, (20140212), XP011539815 [A] 7 * page 4 - page 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSP.2013.2290326 | by applicant | - S. ZHANG; X LI; P. Y KAM; C. YU; J CHEN, "Pilot-assisted decision-aided maximum-likelihood phase estimation in coherent optical phase-modulated systems with nonlinear phase noise", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (201003), vol. 22, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1109/LPT.2009.2039563, pages 380 - 382, XP011287446 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2009.2039563 | - M A. CASTRILLON; D. A. MORERO; M R. HUEDA, "A new cycle slip compensation technique for ultra high speed coherent optical communications", IEEE PHOTONICS CONFERENCE, (201209), doi:doi:10.1109/IPCon.2012.6358547, pages 175 - 176, XP032269017 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPCon.2012.6358547 | - G. UNGERBOECK, "Channel coding with multilevellphase signals", IEEE TRANS. INFORM. THEORY, (198201), vol. IT-28, pages 55 - 67 | - B. P. SMITH; F. R. KSCHISCHANG, "Future prospects for FEC in Fiber-Optic communications", IEEE JOURNAL SELECT. TOPICS QUANTUM ELECTR., (201009), vol. 16, no. 5, XP011309059 | - S. L. HOWARD; C. SCHLEGEL, "Differential turbo-coded modulation with APP channel estimation", IEEE TRANS. COMM., (200608), vol. 54, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/TCCOMM.878827, XP001549022 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCCOMM.878827 | - M G. TAYLOR, "Phase estimation methods for optical coherent detection using digital signal processing", IEEE JOURNAL LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (200904), vol. 22, no. 7 | - G. COLAVOLPE; A. BARBIERI; G. CAIRE, "Algorithms for iterative decoding in the presence of strong phase noise", IEEE J SEL. AREAS COMMUN., (200509), vol. 23, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1109/JSAC.2005.853813, pages 1748 - 1757, XP011138710 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSAC.2005.853813 | - L. HOWARD; C. SCHLEGEL, "Differential turbo-coded modulation with APP channel estimation", IEEE TRANS. COMM., (200608), vol. 54, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/TCCOMM.878827, XP001549022 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCCOMM.878827 |