Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
30.11.2016 | Change - representative | |
03.09.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.08.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.01.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |