EP2863370 - Medium processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 3-16-11 Nishi Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8460 / JP | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Togiya, Hajime c/o Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 1-7-12 Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8460 / JP | 02 /
Takada, Atsushi c/o Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 1-7-12 Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8460 / JP | [2016/01] |
Former [2015/31] | 01 /
Togiya, Hajime c/o Oki Electric Co., Ltd 3-16-11 Nishi Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Takada, Atsushi c/o Oki Electric Co., Ltd 3-16-11 Nishi Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2015/17] | 01 /
Togiya, Hajime c/o Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd 3-16-11 Nishi Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8460 / JP | ||
02 /
Takada, Atsushi c/o Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd 3-16-11 Nishi Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8460 / JP | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14178787.9 | 02.06.2010 | [2015/17] | Priority number, date | JP20090144013 | 17.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009144013 | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2863370 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2863370 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2863370 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/00, G07D9/00, B65H5/06, B65H29/62, B65H29/12 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
B65H5/062 (EP,KR,US);
G07D11/40 (EP,KR,US);
B65H29/12 (EP,KR,US);
B65H29/62 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2401/22 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2402/441 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2403/942 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2404/13161 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2404/1531 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | G07D9/00, B65H5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2015/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Medienverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2015/17] | English: | Medium processing apparatus | [2015/17] | French: | Appareil de traitement de supports | [2015/17] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 23.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10789364.6 / EP2444943 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2010 | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | IS | 17.12.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 02.06.2010 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 02.06.2010 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 02.06.2010 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.06.2010 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.08.2016 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2002162775 (SALTSOV LEON [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 3, 9-11, 13, 16, 17 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]US2005052711 (SCHAEDE JOHANNES GEORG [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US6932208 (WEN YAW-HOING [TW]) [Y] 1-4,6 * abstract ** figure 2a *; | [YA]US2008128240 (UEMIZO YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 4-6 * abstract * * figures 2-5, 12 * [A] 1-3; | [A]US2008128487 (GRAEF H THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0154] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2008217465 |