EP2835579 - Arrangement of solid state light sources and lamp using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [2015/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coleiny, Golshan 135 Granite Street Rockport, MA 01966 / US | 02 /
Zhang, Shiyong 60 Hughes Lane Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 14178855.4 | 29.07.2014 | [2015/07] | Priority number, date | US201313962377 | 08.08.2013 Original published format: US201313962377 | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2835579 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2835579 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21V23/04, H05B33/08, F21S10/02, // F21Y113/00, F21Y105/00, F21Y101/02, F21V13/02, F21V7/00 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
F21S10/023 (EP,US);
H01L33/48 (CN);
F21S2/005 (CN);
F21V13/08 (EP,US);
F21V23/04 (EP,US);
H01L27/153 (US);
H01L33/62 (CN);
H05B45/00 (EP,CN,US);
F21V7/0091 (EP,US);
F21Y2101/00 (CN);
F21Y2105/10 (EP,US);
F21Y2105/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung von Festkörperlichtquellen und Lampe damit | [2015/07] | English: | Arrangement of solid state light sources and lamp using same | [2015/07] | French: | Agencement de sources de lumière à l'état solide et lampe l'utilisant | [2015/07] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 19.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010258819 (MARFELD JAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-8,10-14 * claims 1, 25, 26, 28, 31-34 * * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0052] - [0 55] , [0 56] * [I] 9,15; | [XI]US2009147508 (BERTRAM RALPH [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * claims 1-3, 9-12 * * figures 3-6 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] - [0 46] , [0 60] - [0064] * [I] 9,15; | [ID]US2013088142 (ALLEN STEVEN C [US]) [ID] 1-15 * claims 1-3, 8-10, 14 * * figures 1, 2, 4, 5 * * paragraphs [0019] - [0030] *; | [I]EP1948994 (CREE INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0060] , [0 61] , [0 66] - [0078] *; | [A]US2007223219 (MEDENDORP NICHOLAS W JR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1A, 1B * * paragraphs [0048] - [0055] *; | [A]US2013020929 (VAN DE VEN ANTONY PAUL [HK], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 3A-3G, 6 * * paragraphs [0122] - [0134] - [ 157] - [0160] * | by applicant | US6773139 | US6814463 | US2008019130 | US7431477 | US8174189 | US8096675 | US8368315 | US2012287620 | US2013088142 |