EP2832632 - Chain guide device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landscape Adventures SNC di Dal Col Alberto e Pozzatello Giulio Via Ivo Lollini, 79 31040 Nervesa della Battaglia (TV) / IT | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pozzatello, Giulio Via Canale della Vittoria, 1 31040 Nervesa della Battaglia (Treviso) / IT | 02 /
Dal Col, Alberto Via San Girolamo, 5 31040 Nervesa della Battaglia (Treviso) / IT | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Paris Bordone 9 31100 Treviso / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Paris Bordone 9 31100 Treviso / IT | Application number, filing date | 14179014.7 | 29.07.2014 | [2015/06] | Priority number, date | IT2013TV00119 | 29.07.2013 Original published format: IT TV20130119 | [2015/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832632 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62M9/136, B62J13/00, B62J13/02, // B62M9/00 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
B62M9/136 (EP);
B62J13/00 (EP);
B62J13/02 (EP);
B62M2009/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kettenführungsvorrichtung | [2015/06] | English: | Chain guide device | [2015/06] | French: | Dispositif de guidage de chaîne | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 05.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 08.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2009062049 (CRANSTON RYAN K [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-11 * figures 2,3 * [A] 5,7,12; | [A]DE876055 (JUY LUCIEN CHARLES HIPPOLYTE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH1120764 (KAJIYAMA TADAYOSHI) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102012213480 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2010317475 (TALAVASEK JAN [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * |