EP2835505 - Base load estimation for a combined cycle power plant with steam turbine clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2017/01] |
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Yuhui 1501 Roanoke Boulevard Salem, VA 24153 / US | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Pöpper, Evamaria, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/01] |
Former [2015/07] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14179076.6 | 30.07.2014 | [2015/07] | Priority number, date | US201313960091 | 06.08.2013 Original published format: US201313960091 | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2835505 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2835505 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D15/10, F01K23/10, F02C9/00 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
F01D15/10 (EP,US);
G01L25/00 (US);
F01K5/02 (EP,US);
F02C9/00 (EP,US);
F02C6/18 (EP,US);
F05D2220/64 (EP,US);
F05D2220/72 (EP,US);
F05D2220/76 (EP,US);
F05D2260/4023 (EP,US);
F05D2260/821 (EP,US);
F05D2270/312 (EP,US);
F05D2270/313 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] |
Former [2015/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Abschätzung der Maximallast für ein Kombikraftwerk mit Dampfturbinenkupplung | [2015/07] | English: | Base load estimation for a combined cycle power plant with steam turbine clutch | [2015/07] | French: | Estimation de charge maximale pour une centrale électrique à cycle combiné avec embrayage de turbine à vapeur | [2015/07] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 15.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2014 | AL | 04.01.2017 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | RS | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | SM | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | IE | 30.07.2017 | LU | 30.07.2017 | MT | 30.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
TR | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 30.07.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 30.07.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 30.07.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 30.07.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 30.07.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 30.07.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 30.07.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 30.07.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6164057 (ROWEN WILLIAM IRWIN [US], et al) [A] 1,9,11 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 39 ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP1387045 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,9-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0024] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1503047 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,9-11 * paragraphs [0020] - [0021] - [0024] * * figure 2 *; | [XI]US2011160979 (MUELLER ERIC ANDRE [CH]) [X] 1-8 * page 1 - page 6 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 9-15 |