EP2839758 - SUPPORT DEVICE FOR MANUAL HAIR DRYERS IN SUSPENDED POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/09] | Support device for manual hair dryers in suspended position | ||
[2016/14] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pages Aventin, Eduardo Avda. Menendez Pidal, 14, 3E 22004 Huesca / ES | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [2015/09] | Application number, filing date | 14179334.9 | 31.07.2014 | [2015/09] | Priority number, date | ES20130030993U | 12.08.2013 Original published format: ES 201330993 U | [2015/09] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2839758 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A45D20/12, A45F5/08, A45D20/00, A45D44/06 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
A45D20/12 (EP,US);
A45D44/06 (US);
A45D20/00 (US);
A47F5/0892 (US);
A45D2020/126 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | A45D20/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2015/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGERVORRICHTUNG FÜR MANUELLE HAARTROCKNER IN HÄNGENDER POSITION | [2016/14] | English: | SUPPORT DEVICE FOR MANUAL HAIR DRYERS IN SUSPENDED POSITION | [2016/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT POUR SÉCHOIRS À CHEVEUX MANUELS EN POSITION SUSPENDUE | [2016/14] |
Former [2015/09] | Trägervorrichtung für manuelle Haartrockner in hängender Position | ||
Former [2015/09] | Support device for manual hair dryers in suspended position | ||
Former [2015/09] | Dispositif de support pour séchoirs à cheveux manuels en position suspendue | Examination procedure | 10.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 09.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 05.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7615031U (BUCHNER, E.) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [AD]ES1070451U (PAGES AVENTI EDUARDO [ES]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | ES1052081U | ES1070451U |