EP2859984 - A method of laser processing a transparent material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rofin-Sinar Technologies, LLC 40984 Concept Drive Plymouth MI 48170 / US | [2019/19] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states Rofin-Sinar Technologies, Inc. 40984 Concept Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosseini, S. Abbas 25 Limelight Street Richmond Hill, Ontario L4E0R3 / CA | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Puschmann Borchert Kaiser Klettner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | Application number, filing date | 14179404.0 | 31.07.2014 | [2015/16] | Priority number, date | US201361861880P | 02.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361861880 P | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2859984 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2859984 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2859984 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
B23K26/0648 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23K26/38 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23K26/0626 (US);
B23K26/0006 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/04 (KR);
B23K26/0624 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/064 (KR);
B23K26/082 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/083 (KR);
B23K26/53 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03B33/0222 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03B33/07 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03B33/09 (US);
C03C14/002 (US);
H01L21/78 (EP,US);
B23K2103/00 (CN,US);
B23K2103/42 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,KR,US);
B23K2103/52 (EP,US);
B23K2103/54 (EP,US);
B23K2103/56 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2015/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Laserbearbeitung eines transparenten Materials | [2015/16] | English: | A method of laser processing a transparent material | [2015/16] | French: | Procédé de traitement laser d'un matériau transparent | [2015/16] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 05.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2014 | AL | 20.02.2019 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | ES | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | HR | 20.02.2019 | LT | 20.02.2019 | LV | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | MK | 20.02.2019 | MT | 20.02.2019 | NL | 20.02.2019 | PL | 20.02.2019 | RO | 20.02.2019 | RS | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | SM | 20.02.2019 | TR | 20.02.2019 | BG | 20.05.2019 | NO | 20.05.2019 | GR | 21.05.2019 | IS | 20.06.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | GB | 31.07.2019 | IE | 31.07.2019 | LU | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 31.07.2014 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
MT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
GB | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.07.2014 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
GB | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
GB | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
GB | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
GB | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
GB | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006099810 (VORONOV SERGEI L [US], et al); | [XI]DE102006054073 (DENSO CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2008126742 (CYBER LASER INC [JP], et al); | [XI]WO2012006736 (FILASER INC [CA], et al) | by applicant | US6154593 | WO2011CA50427 |