EP2848724 - Friction damper, especially for washing machines having a drum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bicker, Rainer Posener Str. 34 33415 Verl / DE | 02 /
Templin, Ralf Klippenweg 23 33729 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
Wackermann, Lucas Buddestraße 3 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 14179855.3 | 05.08.2014 | [2015/12] | Priority number, date | DE201310109198 | 26.08.2013 Original published format: DE102013109198 | [2015/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2848724 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2848724 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/22, F16F7/08, F16F7/09, D06F37/20 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
F16F7/09 (EP,US);
F16F7/085 (EP);
D06F37/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2015/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 18.09.2015 | ME | 18.09.2015 | Title | German: | Reibungsdämpfer, insbesondere für Trommelwaschmaschinen | [2015/12] | English: | Friction damper, especially for washing machines having a drum | [2015/12] | French: | Amortisseur à friction, en particulier pour lave-linge à tambour | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 19.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2014 | AL | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | ES | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | MT | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | IE | 05.08.2016 | LU | 05.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1477603 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0043] * * figures 4-11 *; | [AD]DE4420612 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 33 * | by applicant | EP1944402 | DE102008038133 | DE4420612 | EP0407755 |