17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
30.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
20.10.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
11.11.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
07.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.11.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.06.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.02.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.02.2016 |
First examination report |
|
22.01.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
22.01.2016 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
05.01.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.11.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
26.11.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
03.07.2015 |
Interruption |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
03.07.2015 |
Resumption |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
10.02.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
09.01.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |