EP2842956 - PARP inhibitor compounds, compositions and methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai Inc. 100 Tice Boulevard Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677 / US | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xu, Weizheng 3646 Grosvenor Drive Ellicott City, MD Maryland 21042 / US | 02 /
Delahanty, Greg 7801 Tucker Drive Nottingham, MD Maryland 21236 / US | 03 /
Wei, Ling 8515 Thomton Road Lutherville, MD Maryland 21093 / US | 04 /
Zhang, Jie 8513 High Timber Court Ellicott City, MD Maryland 21043 / US | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Stansfield, Kevin Eisai Europe Limited Legal - IP Department European Knowledge Centre Mosquito Way Hatfield, Herts AL10 9SN / GB | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 14179976.7 | 02.10.2008 | [2015/10] | Priority number, date | US20070977115P | 03.10.2007 Original published format: US 977115 P | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2842956 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/06, C07D519/00, A61K31/519, A61P35/00 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D487/06 (EP,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | PARP-Inhibitor-Verbindungen, Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Verwendung | [2015/10] | English: | PARP inhibitor compounds, compositions and methods of use | [2015/10] | French: | Composés inhibiteurs de la PARP, compositions et procédés d'utilisation | [2015/10] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 05.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08836018.5 / EP2209375 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7268138 (KALISH VINCENT J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,3 ** table 1 * | by applicant | US5032617 | US5041653 | US5177075 | US5215738 | WO9833802 | WO9911623 | WO9911628 | WO9911622 | WO9911644 | WO9911945 | WO9911649 | WO9959975 | WO9959973 | WO0039070 | WO0039104 | WO0042040 | US2002028815 | US2003134843 | US2004067949 | WO2005012305 | - PLUMMER ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 11, no. 9, page 3402 | - KOCK ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, page 4961 | - WELTIN ET AL., "Effect of 6(5H)-Phenanthridinone, an Inhibitor ofPoly(ADP-ribosc) Polymerase, on Cultured Tumor Cells", ONCOL. RES., (1994), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 399 - 403 | - BRYANT ET AL., "Specific killing of BRCA2-deficient tumours with inhibitors ofpoly(ADP-ribose) polymerase", NATURE, (2005), vol. 434, doi:doi:10.1038/nature03443, page 913, XP007906257 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03443 | - FARMER ET AL., "Targeting the DNA repair defect in BRCA mutant cells as a therapeutic strategy", NATURE, (2005), vol. 434, doi:doi:10.1038/nature03445, page 917, XP002516395 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03445 | - MCCABE ET AL., "Deficiency in the Repair of DNA Damage by Homologous Recombination and Sensitivity to Poly(ADP-Ribose) Polymerase Inhibition", CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-0140, page 8109, XP002498068 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-0140 | - ZAREMBA ET AL., "PARP Inhibitor Development for Systemic Cancer Targeting", ANTI-CANCER AGENTS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 7, page 515, XP009107679 | - LEWIS ET AL., "Clinical poly(ADP-ribose) polymerase inhibitors for the treatment of cancer", CURR. OPIN. INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (2007), vol. 8, page 1061 | - BANASIK ET AL., "Specific Inhibitors ofPoly(ADP-Ribose) Synthetase and Mono(ADP-Ribosyl)-Transferase", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, no. 3, pages 1569 - 75 | - BANASIK ET AL., "Inhibitors and Activators of ADP-Ribosylation Reactions", MOLEC. CELL. BIOCHEM., (1994), vol. 138, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00928461, pages 185 - 97, XP009050157 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00928461 | - MILAM ET AL., "Inhibitors of Poly(Adenosine Diphosphate-Ribose) Synthesis; Effect on Other Metabolic Processes", SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 223, pages 589 - 91 | - LI; ZHANG, IDrugs, PHARMAPRESS LTD, (2001), vol. 4, pages 804 - 812 | - WHITE AW ET AL., BIOORG. AND MED. CHEM LETTS., (2004), vol. 14, page 2433 | - CANON KOCH SS ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, page 4961 | - SKALITSKY DJ ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2003), vol. 46, page 210 | - FARMER H ET AL., NATURE, (20050414), vol. 434, page 917 | - PLUMMER ER ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 11, no. 9, page 3402 | - TIKHE JG ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, page 5467 | - QUASTHOFF; HARTUNG, J. NEUROLOGY, (2002), vol. 249, pages 9 - 17 | - FARMER ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 434, page 917 | - DESOTO; DENG, INTL. J. MED. SCI., (2006), vol. 3, page 117 | - BRYANT ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 434, page 913 | - "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, no. 1, pages 1 - 19 | - Burgers Medicinal Chemistry and Drug Chemistry, (1995), vol. 1, pages 172 - 178,949- | - TENTORI ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RESER., (2003), vol. 9, page 5370 | - J.T. BAKER, ULTRAPURE BIOREAGENT, pages 4221 - 02 | US20040853714 |