EP2860041 - Multi-layer body and method for producing a multi-layer body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE | For all designated states OVD Kinegram AG Zählerweg 11 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE | ||
For all designated states OVD Kinegram AG Zählerweg 11 6300 Zug / CH | |||
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE | ||
For all designated states OVD Kinegram AG Zählerweg 12 6301 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Staub, René Hofmatt 24 6332 Hagendorn / CH | 02 /
Brehm, Ludwig Vogtlandstr. 16 91325 Adelsdorf / DE | 03 /
Attner, Juri Lindelburger Str. 11 90559 Burgthann / DE | 04 /
Seeholzer, Peter Steinhofstr. 33 6005 Luzern / CH | 05 /
Hoffmann, Michael Sternenmatt 1 6318 Walchwil / CH | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2015/16] | Application number, filing date | 14180087.0 | 06.08.2014 | [2015/16] | Priority number, date | DE201310108666 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: DE102013108666 | [2015/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2860041 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2860041 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/36, B42D25/45, B42D25/328, B42D25/445, B42D25/425 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/36 (EP,US);
B42D25/425 (EP,US);
B42D25/445 (EP,US);
B42D25/45 (EP,US);
B41M7/0045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/16] | B42D25/00, B42D25/29, B42D25/355, B42D25/465, B42D25/445 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] |
Former [2015/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Mehrschichtkörpers sowie Mehrschichtkörper | [2015/16] | English: | Multi-layer body and method for producing a multi-layer body | [2015/16] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un corps multicouches et corps multicouches | [2015/16] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 30.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2018/07] | 29.01.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.06.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.10.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2020/17] | 23.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.12.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2014 | AL | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | MT | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | IE | 06.08.2017 | LU | 06.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | AT | 06.08.2019 | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/34] | HU | 06.08.2014 | |
AL | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.08.2014 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 06.08.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | HR | 05.04.2017 | |
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | HR | 05.04.2017 | |
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO9527925 (APPLIED HOLOGRAPHICS [GB], et al) [X] 1,12 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 27; figures 1-4 * [A] 7-11 [Y] 2-6; | [XAY]DE10333255 (KURZ LEONHARD FA [DE]) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0045] , [0049] , [0052] , [0053] - [0057]; figures 1,2 * [A] 7-11 [Y] 2-6; | [XAY]US2012064303 (YASHIKI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0106] , [0133] , [0136] - [0140] - [0145]; figures 1-6 * [A] 7-11 [Y] 2-6; | [X]DE102006037431 (OVD KINEGRAM AG [CH]) [X] 12-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0032] - [0034] - [0036] , [0038] , [0244] , [0255]; figures 22A,22B; claims 6,57,72 * | Opposition | DE10333255 | US2012064303 | DE102006037431 | DE29622700U | EP2196312 | WO0231214 | DE10143523 |