EP2801845 - Method for measuring wettability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP EXPLORATION OPERATING COMPANY LIMITED Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB | [2014/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Quan BP Exploration Operating Company Limited Chertsey Road Sunbury on Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | 02 /
Collins, Ian Ralph BP Exploration Operating Company Limited Chertsey Road Sunbury on Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | Collins, Frances Mary, et al BP International Limited Global Patents & Technology Law Chertsey Road Sunbury on Thames, Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB | [2017/05] |
Former [2014/46] | Wilson, Nicola Ann BP International Limited Global Patents & Technology Law Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middx TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 14180270.2 | 19.11.2010 | [2014/46] | Priority number, date | EP20090252811 | 16.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09252811 | GB20100007694 | 06.05.2010 Original published format: GB 201007694 | [2014/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2801845 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2801845 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/32 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
G01V3/32 (EP,US);
G01N24/081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2014/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung der Benetzbarkeit | [2014/46] | English: | Method for measuring wettability | [2014/46] | French: | Procédé de mesure de mouillabilité | [2014/46] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 12.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10787525.4 / EP2513678 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2010 | AL | 01.02.2017 | AT | 01.02.2017 | CY | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | EE | 01.02.2017 | ES | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | HR | 01.02.2017 | IT | 01.02.2017 | LT | 01.02.2017 | LV | 01.02.2017 | MC | 01.02.2017 | MK | 01.02.2017 | PL | 01.02.2017 | RO | 01.02.2017 | RS | 01.02.2017 | SE | 01.02.2017 | SI | 01.02.2017 | SK | 01.02.2017 | SM | 01.02.2017 | TR | 01.02.2017 | BG | 01.05.2017 | GR | 02.05.2017 | IS | 01.06.2017 | PT | 01.06.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
TR | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004000905 (FREEDMAN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0006] , [0070] - [0072]; figure 1 *; | [A]US5162733 (BALDWIN BERNARD A [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 17 - line 24 * * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 15 * * column 5, line 24 - line 50 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 43 * * column 9, line 10 - line 30 *; | [A]US2006132131 (FLEURY MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0020] - [0028] *; | [A]US4022276 (DREHER KARL D, et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US2009167302 (EDWARDS JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - HSU W., LI X., FLUMERFELT R.W., "Wettability of Porous Media by NMR Relaxation Methods", SOCIETY OF PETROLEUM ENGINEERS, SPE, (19921004), no. SPE24761, pages 1027 - 1037, XP002582762 [A] 1-11 * page 1027, Introduction page 1028; "Wettability and NMR Relaxation" page 1030; "Amott/USBM Method" * | [A] - LOOYESTIJN W., HOFMAN J., "Wettability Index Determination by Nuclear Magnetic Resonance", SOCIETY OF PETROLEUM ENGINEERS, SPE, (20050312), no. SPE93624, pages 1 - 8, XP002582763 [A] 1-11 * page 1,2; Wettability determination page 2; Concept and Application of a NMR Wettability Index page 4; Inversion of forward model page 5; Implementation for laboratory measurements * |