EP2837945 - Photovoltaic power measurement system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | For all designated states Hosei University 2-17-1 Fujimi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hosei University 2-17-1 Fujimi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanagisawa, Yoshiki c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tsubota, Takashi c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shinagawa, Mitsuru c/o Hosei University 2-17-1, Fujimi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14180271.0 | 07.08.2014 | [2015/08] | Priority number, date | JP20130169150 | 16.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013169150 | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2837945 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/40 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
H02S50/00 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2015/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur Messung von photovoltaischer Energie | [2015/08] | English: | Photovoltaic power measurement system | [2015/08] | French: | Système de mesure de puissance photovoltaïque | [2015/08] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 19.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP2546634 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP], et al) [I] 1,4-15 * figures 1-5, 7, 9, 10 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraphs [0073] , [0 79] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0092] * [Y] 2,3; | [I]US2003059966 (ELLISON TIMOTHY [US]) [I] 1,4-15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0007] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] *; | [I]WO2013056735 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] , [0 13] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0017] , [0018] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraphs [0043] , [0045] , [0051] *; | [A]US2010219327 (ARBORE MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraphs [0061] , [0083] *; | [A]DE102011105869 (ADENSIS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0039] , [0044] *; | [A]US2006006886 (YAMASHITA MASATSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0081] , [0088] , [0089] *; | [Y]EP0586226 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 1 - line 2 * * page 5, line 4 - line 27 * | [I] - NAKANISHI H ET AL, "Imaging of local photo-excited current in solar cell using a laser terahertz emission microscope", LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS (CLEO), 2012 CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120506), ISBN 978-1-4673-1839-6, pages 1 - 2, XP032246461 [I] 1,4-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/CLEO_SI.2012.CTu3B.2 | by applicant | JPH0394175 | JP2000171488 |