EP2852138 - HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/13] | Head mounted display system | ||
[2019/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeouidaero Yeongdeungpogu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2019/27] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Doohwan c/o LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 137-893 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Byungju c/o LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 137-893 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Jeon, Raon c/o LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 137-893 Seoul / KR | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2019/43] |
Former [2015/13] | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14180591.1 | 12.08.2014 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | KR20130112772 | 23.09.2013 Original published format: KR 20130112772 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2852138 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2852138 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N1/21, G02B27/01 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
H04N1/00183 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (KR);
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B27/02 (KR);
H04N1/00381 (EP,US);
H04N1/00493 (EP,US);
H04N1/00564 (EP,US);
H04N1/212 (EP,US);
H04N1/2125 (EP,US);
H04N13/344 (EP,US);
H04N23/61 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0123 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
G02B2027/014 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3245 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3251 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3253 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | H04N1/00, H04N1/21, H04N13/04, G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2015/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUF DEM KOPF GETRAGENES ANZEIGESYSTEM | [2019/20] | English: | HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2019/20] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE PORTÉ SUR LA TÊTE | [2019/24] |
Former [2015/13] | Auf dem Kopf getragenes Anzeigesystem | ||
Former [2015/13] | Head mounted display system | ||
Former [2015/13] | Systeme d'affichage porte sur la tete | Examination procedure | 04.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 19.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2014 | AL | 23.10.2019 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | GR | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 12.08.2014 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MK | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.08.2014 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 23.10.2019 | |
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2007129480 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1898634 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0302] , [0303] *; | [Y]US2009244323 (CARTER SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0044] , [0045] *; | [Y]US2009268074 (SUGINO YOUICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]US2010110368 (CHAUM DAVID [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0110] *; | [Y]GB2465280 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]US8223088 (GOMEZ LUIS RICARDO PRADA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 6, lines 11-27 * * column 21, line 35 - column 22, line 29 *; | [Y]US2013038522 (NARA KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0081] - [0090]; figures 12,13 *; | [XY]GB2494940 (GIXIA GROUP CO [TW]) [X] 1,2,8,15 * page 2, lines 1-7 * * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 8 * * figures 1,5,8,10 * [Y] 3-7,9-14; | [Y]WO2013093906 (EYESIGHT MOBILE TECH LTD [IL]) [Y] 1-15 * figure - * | Examination | WO2013087974 |