EP2818430 - Cassette for dispensing bags from an elongated tubing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Refills Company Limited Wimberley Rockley New Road Christ Church BB15126 / BB | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morand, Michel 5000, rue d'lberville bureau 311 Montréal, Québec H2H 2S6 / CA | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/19] |
Former [2015/01] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 14180823.8 | 05.10.2007 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2818430 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2818430 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/06, // B65B9/15 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
B65F1/062 (EP,US);
B65B43/267 (US);
B65B67/1266 (US);
B65B67/1277 (EP,US);
B65B9/20 (US);
B65F1/16 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/01] | Title | German: | Kassette zur Abgabe von Beuteln aus einem Folienschlauch | [2015/01] | English: | Cassette for dispensing bags from an elongated tubing | [2015/01] | French: | Cassette de distribution de sacs à partir d'un tube allongé | [2015/01] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 29.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2019 | Observations by third parties | 18.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07019571.4 / EP2045197 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.2020
07.10.2020
ADMISSIBLE Velovendo S.r.l. Via degli Artigiani 22 39100 Bolzano (BZ) / IT Opponent's representative Rondano, Davide Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | 02
13.10.2020
B & L Bavendiek Lehmann Handelsgesellschaft mbH Rouen Kamp 20 49439 Steinfeld / DE Opponent's representative Pelster Behrends Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Bosch-Straße 17b 48153 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.2020
07.10.2020
ADMISSIBLE Velovendo S.r.l. Via degli Artigiani 22 39100 Bolzano (BZ) / IT Opponent's representative Rondano, Davide Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | ||
02
13.10.2020
B & L Bavendiek Lehmann Handelsgesellschaft mbH Rouen Kamp 20 49439 Steinfeld / DE Opponent's representative Pelster Behrends Patentanwälte PartG mbB Haus Sentmaring 17 48151 Münster / DE | |||
Former [2020/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.2020
07.10.2020
ADMISSIBLE Velovendo S.r.l. Via degli Artigiani 22 39100 Bolzano (BZ) / IT Opponent's representative Rondano, Davide Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | 24.02.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.07.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2023/25] | 27.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.02.2023 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | IE | 05.10.2020 | LU | 05.10.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/46] | CZ | 06.05.2020 | |
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.10.2020 | ||
LU | 05.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 06.05.2020 | |
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 05.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 06.05.2020 | |
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 06.05.2020 | |
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0303517 (MESCHT LEON V D); | [XA]WO02100723 (SANGENIC INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB], et al); | [XA]US2003121923 (MORAND MICHEL [CA], et al); | [XA]WO2007071054 (INT REFILLS CO LTD [BB], et al) | by applicant | CA1298191 | CA2383799 | CA2441837 | Opposition | EP0303517 | EP0353922 | WO02100723 | US2003121923 | US2003154696 | WO2007071054 | US3536192 | US3746159 | SE391451 | US4934529 | US6128890 | US2006130439 | US2006237461 | WO2007028230 |