EP2849460 - Energy converter, speaker, and method of manufacturing energy converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinotsuka, Michiaki c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Kawase, Tsutomu c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2019/32] |
Former [2015/12] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14181210.7 | 18.08.2014 | [2015/12] | Priority number, date | JP20130189112 | 12.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013189112 | JP20140016415 | 31.01.2014 Original published format: JP 2014016415 | JP20140079143 | 08.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014079143 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2849460 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2849460 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | [2015/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2849460 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/02, H04R31/00, H04R9/00, H04R7/00, H04R9/04 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H04R7/00 (EP,US);
H04R9/02 (US);
H04R31/00 (US);
H04R9/00 (EP,US);
H04R9/04 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/14] | H04R7/00, H04R9/00, H04R9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | Energiewandler, Lautsprecher und Verfahren zur Herstellung des Energiewandlers | [2015/12] | English: | Energy converter, speaker, and method of manufacturing energy converter | [2015/12] | French: | Convertisseur d'énergie, haut-parleur et procédé de fabrication d'un tel convertisseur | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 23.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2014 | AL | 07.08.2019 | AT | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | DK | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | ES | 07.08.2019 | FI | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | NL | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | RS | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | IE | 18.08.2019 | LU | 18.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | NO | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | IS | 07.12.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 18.08.2014 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 18.08.2019 | ||
LU | 18.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.08.2014 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 18.08.2019 | ||
LU | 18.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 18.08.2019 | ||
LU | 18.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 18.08.2019 | ||
LU | 18.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 18.08.2019 | ||
LU | 18.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 18.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 18.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NO | 07.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB249062 (PAUL GEORGES HUGUET D AMOUR) [Y] 7 * figure 6 *; | [Y]GB295057 (HENRY NOEL WILSON) [Y] 6 * figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US5003610 (ADACHI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,13 * the whole document * [I] 3,8-12,14; | [XYI]US2002126867 (AIZIK ELIEZER [IL]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,13 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7 [I] 3,5,8,11,12,14; | [A]US2003194106 (TSUDA SHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | Examination | WO02063922 | by applicant | JP2010251816 |