Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP2818055

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 28.10.2020
 BELapse: 31.12.2020
 BGLapse: 28.01.2021
 CH 
CYLapse: 28.10.2020
 CZLapse: 28.10.2020
 DE 
 DKLapse: 28.10.2020
 EELapse: 28.10.2020
 ESLapse: 28.10.2020
 FILapse: 28.10.2020
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 29.01.2021
 HRLapse: 28.10.2020
 HULapse: 05.12.2008
 IELapse: 05.12.2020
 ISLapse: 28.02.2021
 ITLapse: 28.10.2020
 LI 
 LTLapse: 28.10.2020
 LULapse: 05.12.2020
 LVLapse: 28.10.2020
 MCLapse: 28.10.2020
 MTLapse: 28.10.2020
 NL 
 NOLapse: 28.01.2021
 PLLapse: 28.10.2020
 PTLapse: 01.03.2021
 ROLapse: 28.10.2020
 SELapse: 28.10.2020
 SILapse: 28.10.2020
 SKLapse: 28.10.2020
 TRLapse: 28.10.2020
Examination procedure21.09.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
24.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
20.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
15.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
04.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
European patent granted28.10.2020
Opposition procedure14.03.2023Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked 
Appeal following opposition11.05.2023APPEAL FILED
11.05.2023DATE PAYMENT APPEAL FEE
20.07.2023APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140819
 
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2230940
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:20.07.2016 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20160620
 
Event date:22.04.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23L 33/19 20160101ALI20200317BHEP
 
Event date:22.04.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23L 33/00 20160101ALI20200317BHEP
 
Event date:22.04.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23L 33/21 20160101ALI20200317BHEP
 
Event date:22.04.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 35/20 20060101AFI20200317BHEP
 
Event date:27.05.2020 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20200430
 
Event date:22.09.2020 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:29.04.2020 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:25.09.2020 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:17.03.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079 602008063416 DE
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A23L0001290000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K0035200000
 
Event date:28.10.2020 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:28.10.2020 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2230940
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:28.10.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:30.10.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:12.11.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602008063416 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:15.11.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1327521 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20201115
 
Event date:25.11.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:23.12.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:15.03.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 1327521 AT T
Code Expl.:-DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT)
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:13.03.2020 
Event description:OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA
 
Event date:21.05.2019 
Event description:OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA
 
Event date:15.06.2018 
Event description:OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA
 
Event date:25.09.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED
 
Event date:29.04.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:25.01.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:30.12.2014 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210129
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210128
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210301
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:25.05.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210128
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210228
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:30.06.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:14.07.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602008063416 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
 
Event date:30.07.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:30.07.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:30.07.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:30.07.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:30.07.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:18.08.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:ARLA FOODS AMBA
Effective DATE:20210714
 
Event date:01.09.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Effective DATE:20210723
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:08.09.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:EVEN SANTE INDUSTRIE
Effective DATE:20210728
 
Event date:08.09.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Effective DATE:20210728
 
Event date:03.09.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20201231
 
Event date:13.10.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
OPPONENT:EVEN SANTE INDUSTRIE
Effective DATE:20210728
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20201205
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20201205
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:25.01.2022 
Event description:REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3
 
Event date:14.09.2021 
Event description:NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2
 
Event date:10.09.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO
 
Event date:09.09.2021 
Event description:EXAMINATION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF OPPOSITION: REPLY RECEIVED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOPE4
 
Event date:06.08.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260
 
Event date:04.08.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION DELETED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDOBS2
 
Event date:04.08.2021 
Event description:NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2
 
Event date:02.08.2021 
Event description:EXAMINATION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF OPPOSITION: DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION + TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOPE2
 
Event date:30.07.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260
 
Event date:16.07.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201028
 
Event date:29.07.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20201231
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210228
 
Event date:13.03.2023 
Event description:COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1
 
Event date:12.05.2023 
Event description:APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO
 
Event date:12.05.2023 
Event description:DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O
 
Event date:12.05.2023 
Event description:APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO
 
Event date:14.06.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230510
 
Event date:21.07.2023 
Event description:APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO
 
Event date:21.07.2023 
Event description:DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20241213
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:17.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20241217
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:20.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20241227
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:11.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20241227
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:24.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20250101
Year of Fee Payment:17