EP2851925 - Two-pole circuit breakers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Industry, Inc. 100 Technology Drive Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | [2017/06] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Siemens Industry, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005-4437 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endozo, Joselito 2547 Courtney Renea Drive Dacula, GA 30019 / US | 02 /
Watford, Russell Thomas 2086 Vicksburg Drive Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | [2022/44] |
Former [2015/13] | 01 /
Endozo, Joselito 2547 Courtney Renea Drive Dacula, GA Georgia 30019 / US | ||
02 /
Watford, Russell Thomas 2086 Vicksburg Drive Lawrenceville, GA Georgia 30044 / US | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/13] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14181444.2 | 19.08.2014 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | US201314024041 | 11.09.2013 Original published format: US201314024041 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851925 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2851925 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/10, H01H83/22 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
H01H71/1009 (EP,CN,US);
H01H73/00 (US);
H01H83/226 (EP,CN,US);
H02H3/00 (US);
H02H3/10 (US);
H02H3/16 (US);
H01H2071/124 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2015/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zweipolige Schutzschalter | [2015/13] | English: | Two-pole circuit breakers | [2015/13] | French: | Disjoncteurs bipolaires | [2015/13] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | AT | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005073780 (ELMS ROBERT T [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005103613 (MILLER THEODORE J [US]) [Y] 16-18 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2007123389 (FONG SEE NI [MY]) [Y] 16-18* page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 30; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2010020453 (MCCOY BRIAN TIMOTHY [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-7 * |