EP2987744 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SIDE GUSSETED PACKAGING BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/08] | Side folding packaging bag and method for producing a side folding packaging bag | ||
[2016/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mondi AG Marxergasse 4A 1030 Wien / AT | [2017/19] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states Mondi Consumer Packaging Technologies GmbH Jöbkesweg 11 48599 Gronau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kösters Jens Küsterkamp 12 49134 Wallenhorst / DE | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2016/08] | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 DE-45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14182026.6 | 22.08.2014 | [2016/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2987744 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2987744 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D30/20, B65D30/08, B31B70/74 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
B65D31/10 (EP);
B31B70/008 (EP,US);
B29C53/066 (EP);
B29C55/065 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C66/004 (EP);
B29C66/133 (EP);
B29C66/431 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/723 (EP);
B29C66/73712 (EP);
B29C66/83221 (EP);
B32B1/00 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/327 (EP);
B32B3/04 (EP);
B32B3/266 (EP);
B32B7/02 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B65D31/02 (EP);
B65D33/02 (EP);
B29C65/18 (EP);
B29C66/7352 (EP);
B29L2031/7128 (EP);
B31B2150/00 (EP);
B31B2150/002 (EP);
B31B2150/003 (EP);
B31B2160/20 (EP);
B31B2170/20 (EP);
B31B70/642 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (EP);
B32B2307/516 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/0616 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/0641 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/065 (EP) |
Former IPC [2016/08] | B65D30/20, B65D30/08, B31B19/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SEITENFALTENVERPACKUNGSBEUTELS | [2016/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SIDE GUSSETED PACKAGING BAG | [2016/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SAC D'EMBALLAGE À SOUFFLET LATÉRAL | [2016/51] |
Former [2016/08] | Seitenfaltenverpackungsbeutel sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Seitenfaltenverpackungsbeutels | ||
Former [2016/08] | Side folding packaging bag and method for producing a side folding packaging bag | ||
Former [2016/08] | Sac d'emballage à soufflet latéral et procédé de fabrication d'un sac d'emballage à soufflet latéral | Examination procedure | 17.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 27.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2014 | AL | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MK | 05.07.2017 | MT | 05.07.2017 | NL | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | RS | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | SM | 05.07.2017 | IE | 22.08.2017 | LU | 22.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | NO | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | |
NO | 05.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0729886 (ROVEMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 7,14 * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 38 ** column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 4; figures 1-3,5 *; | [A]EP2039620 (NORDENIA D HALLE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7,14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0022] , [0023]; figures 1-3,5 *; | [AD]EP2186741 (NORDENIA D HALLE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-7,9-12,14 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1A,1B *; | [YA]EP2368706 (NORDENIA D HALLE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0024]; figures 1,6 * [A] 7,14; | [Y]US2012033901 (VOTAW BRIAN E [US]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | EP0523542 | EP0842044 | EP2040920 | EP2186741 |