EP2840727 - Operation panel structure and control method and control apparatus for mixing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okabayashi, Masaaki Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, 430-8650 / JP | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Emil-Riedel-Straße 18 80538 München / DE | [2021/11] |
Former [2015/09] | Ettmayr, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14182067.0 | 12.12.2003 | [2015/09] | Priority number, date | JP20020371766 | 24.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002371766 | JP20020371779 | 24.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002371779 | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2840727 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2840727 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2840727 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/04 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
H04H60/04 (EP,US);
H03G3/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/08] |
Former [2015/09] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Bedienungstafelstruktur und Steuerverfahren und Steuervorrichtung für Mischsystem | [2015/09] | English: | Operation panel structure and control method and control apparatus for mixing system | [2015/09] | French: | Structure de panneau de commande et procédé de commande et appareil de commande pour système de mélange | [2015/09] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2020 | 14.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03104675.8 / EP1434372 | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 18.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 18.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.03.2021 | [2022/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0251646 (AMEK SYST & CONTROLS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,7-11 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO9937046 (SHOWCO INC [US]) [X] 1,7 * the whole document * [A] 8-11; | [XA]US2002065570 (FUJITA YOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * the whole document * [A] 8-11; | [A]US2002156547 (SUYAMA AKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,7-11* the whole document *; | [XA]US2002188364 (OTA MITSUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0044] - [0057]; figure -; claim - * [A] 8-11 | by applicant | US5402501 |